Bourgeois v. Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cory Phillip Bourgeois
Defendant: McMoran Oil & Gas LLC and Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04177
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon R. Ramirez on behalf of Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, filed. (Ramirez, Shannon)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, filed. (Quin, Justin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Brendan P. Doherty in place of Justin P. Quin by Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doherty, Brendan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Freeport-McMoRan Inc., Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, filed.(Quin, Justin)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cory Phillip Bourgeois, filed.(Jordan, Janie)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 3/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy, filed. (bwhite, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Cory Phillip Bourgeois.(Jordan, Janie)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 First CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC, McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, filed.(Quin, Justin)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th JDC, Harris County, case number 2019-68907 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23434294) filed by McMoran Oil & Gas LLC, Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings and Service, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(Quin, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois v. Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Phillip Bourgeois
Represented By: Janie L Jordan
Represented By: Richard Warren Mithoff, Jr
Represented By: Warner Vandergriff Hocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McMoran Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Justin Pierce Quin
Represented By: Grady S Hurley
Represented By: Shannon Robbie Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeport-McMoRan Oil & Gas LLC
Represented By: Justin Pierce Quin
Represented By: Grady S Hurley
Represented By: Shannon Robbie Ramirez
Represented By: Brendan P Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?