Bloomfield v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Bloomfield
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC and Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Case Number: 4:2019cv04213
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Gardner Mason on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed. (Mason, Leslie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed.(McNiel, D)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Hoffman on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed. (Hoffman, Matthew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Docketed in Error - NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Hoffman on behalf of Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed. (Loftis, James) Modified on 11/4/2019 (hlerma, 4).
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), filed.(McNiel, D)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Proposed Order)(McNiel, D)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Motiva Enterprises LLC, filed.(Hoffman, Matthew)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 165th Harris County District Court, case number 2019-69148 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23440888) filed by Motiva Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew Hoffman)(McNiel, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloomfield v. Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Bloomfield
Represented By: Omar Weaver Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: D Ferguson McNiel
Represented By: Matthew Charles Hoffman
Represented By: Leslie Denise Gardner Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Of Saudi Arabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?