Thorco Projects A/S et al v. Massoel Shipping S.A et al
Plaintiff: Massoel Shipping S.A, SCL Basilisk AG and Thorco Projects A/S
Defendant: Vestas-American Wind Technology, Inc. and Vestas Wind Technology India PVT. LTD
Case Number: 4:2019cv04219
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:1300
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 Final DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed without prejudice #3 . Case terminated on 10/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Thorco Projects A/S, SCL Basilisk AG, Massoel Shipping S.A, filed. (Wallis, Trenton)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vestas Wind Technology India PVT. LTD, Vestas-American Wind Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23442780) filed by SCL Basilisk AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wallis, Trenton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thorco Projects A/S et al v. Massoel Shipping S.A et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Massoel Shipping S.A
Represented By: Jason P Waguespack
Represented By: Trenton J Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCL Basilisk AG
Represented By: Jason P Waguespack
Represented By: Trenton J Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thorco Projects A/S
Represented By: Jason P Waguespack
Represented By: Dabney Welsh Pettus
Represented By: Trenton J Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestas-American Wind Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vestas Wind Technology India PVT. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?