Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc. v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc.
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04242
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice as moot. #3 Initial Motion to Dismiss filed on 11/4/2019.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified.(cjan, 4) Modified on 12/10/2019 (cjan, 4).
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., Motions referred to Christina A Bryan. by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. filed by Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc.. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Plaintiff's president, #2 Exhibit Chase deposit agreement, #3 Exhibit DTPA letter sent to Chase)(Damani, Anis)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Tomsen, Jennifer)
November 24, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc.. (Damani, Anis)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anis Damani on behalf of Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc., filed. (Damani, Anis)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tomsen, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/20/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-64024 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23450818) filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tomsen, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc. v. JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casa De Dios Bautista Westview, Inc.
Represented By: Anis Nurudin Damani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jennifer Tomsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?