Prentiss v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Jean Prentiss
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv04279
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to #6 Reply [DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS], filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Curran, Charles)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY To Defendant's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Jean Prentiss. (Prisock, Kerry)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Cases Not in a Reporter in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Rule 12(B)(6) Motion to Dismiss)(Curran, Charles)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #3 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, by PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Curran, Charles)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed.(Curran, Charles)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County 284th District Court, case number 19-09-13216 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23471091) filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit C-4, #7 Exhibit C-5, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Curran, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prentiss v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Prentiss
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Represented By: Kerry Lee Prisock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Charles Royal Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?