Harris v. CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Wilber C Harris
Defendant: Baylor College of Medicine, CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine d/b/a Baylor St. Luke's Medical Center and CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine Medical Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv04293
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine Medical Center, filed.(Luccia, Frank)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wilber C Harris, filed.(Painter, Robert)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine, filed.(Luccia, Frank)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baylor College of Medicine, CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine d/b/a Baylor St. Luke's Medical Center (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23480069) filed by Wilber C Harris.(Painter, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilber C Harris
Represented By: Robert Warren Painter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baylor College of Medicine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine d/b/a Baylor St. Luke's Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHI St. Luke's Health Baylor College of Medicine Medical Center
Represented By: Frank N Luccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?