Johnson v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Julia Johnson
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc., United Airlines Inc and Brent Wright
Case Number: 4:2019cv04322
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brent Wright, filed.(Stilwell, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 1/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (SusanGram, 3)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge George C Hanks, Jr recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-60102 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23489413) filed by Mesa Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit List of All Counsel of Record, #3 Exhibit Certified State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit Return of Service on Mesa Airlines, #7 Exhibit Return of Service on United Airlines, #8 Exhibit Affidavit of Mr. Wright, #9 Exhibit Answer of Wright & Mesa Airlines, #10 Exhibit Answer of United Airlines, #11 Exhibit Certified Record Secretary of State (Mesa), #12 Exhibit Mesa Public Franchise Report, #13 Exhibit Certified Record Secretary of State (United), #14 Exhibit United Public Franchise Report)(Stilwell, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Johnson
Represented By: Richard Jason Nava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Richard T Stilwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines Inc
Represented By: Richard T Stilwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Wright
Represented By: Richard T Stilwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?