United States of America v. $633,769.29 Seized from Bank of America Account 7622, et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $633,769.29 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7622, $800,006.25 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7158, $250,000.00 SEIZED FROM JPMORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT 1978 & $250,000.00 SEIZED and $633,769.29 Seized from Bank of America Account 7622, $800,006.25 Seized from Bank of America Account 7158, $250,000.00 seizd from JPMorgan Chase Account 1978, $250,000.00 Seized F
Petitioner: U.S. Silica Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04323
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 Petition for Ancillary Hearing/Other Miscellaneous Relief ( Filing fee $ 47 receipt number 0541-23727264.) filed by U.S. Silica Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(De Santos, Laura)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to U.S. Marshal Service on 12/4/2019 re: Warrant of Arrest, filed.(jguajardo, 4)
November 15, 2019 Warrant of Arrest in Rem Issued as to $633,769.29 Seized from Bank of America Account 7622, $800,006.25 Seized from Bank of America Account 7158, $250,000.00 seizd from JPMorgan Chase Account 1978, $250,000.00 Seized F. Issued Warrant of Arrest in Rem delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(mmapps, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States Of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States Of America, filed.(Rollinson, Kristine)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/2/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $633,769.29 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7622, $800,006.25 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7158, $250,000.00 SEIZED FROM JPMORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT 1978 & $250,000.00 SEIZED filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Rollinson, Kristine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $633,769.29 Seized from Bank of America Account 7622, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $633,769.29 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7622, $800,006.25 SEIZED FROM BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT 7158, $250,000.00 SEIZED FROM JPMORGAN CHASE ACCOUNT 1978 & $250,000.00 SEIZED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $633,769.29 Seized from Bank of America Account 7622, $800,006.25 Seized from Bank of America Account 7158, $250,000.00 seizd from JPMorgan Chase Account 1978, $250,000.00 Seized F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kristine E Rollinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. Silica Company
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?