J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Arriaga et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Luz M. Arriaga, Luz Maria Perez and Carlos Arriaga
Case Number: 4:2019cv04330
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 2/3/2020 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carlos Arriaga, Luz M. Arriaga. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Luz M. Arriaga)(Diaz, David)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:30 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J&J Sports Productions, Inc., filed.(Diaz, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23496323) filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc..(Diaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Arriaga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz M. Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luz Maria Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?