Williams v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Theresa Williams
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04384
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Mark Douglas Cronenwett terminated.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Hord, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Michael F. Hord Jr. in place of Mark D. Cronenwett by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hord, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Bank, N.A., filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court 11th Judicial District of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-79154 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23523025) filed by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Michael F Hord, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Williams
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?