Bob et al v. U.S. Dept. of Housing and Urban Development et al
Plaintiff: LaGladys Oliver-Davis, Cherry Lee Johnson, Theodore David, Angenitta Oaks, Port Arthur Community Action Network, Denise Swan, Rodney Bob, Brenda Jones, Sherry Butler, Vanessa Wharton and Ruth Ortiz
Defendant: Land Commissioner George P. Bush, US Secrety of HUD BEN CARSON, U.S. Dept. of Housing and Urban Development, Texas General Land Office, The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, State of Texas General Land Office, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development and Texas Land Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv04404
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 29 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to State of Texas General Land Office served on 12/5/2019, answer due 1/22/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jones, Ashea)
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Texas Land Commissioner served on 12/2/2019, answer due 1/22/2020, filed.(Jones, Ashea)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Courtesy Copy of Reply in Support ofMtn to Consolidate by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lyles, Benjamin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Reply in support of Mtn to Consolidate by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lyles, Benjamin)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Opposition by Sherry Butler, Brenda Jones, Ruth Ortiz, Vanessa Wharton, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Brief Opposing Motion to Consolidate)(Zummo, Rachel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Opposition by Brenda Jones, Ruth Ortiz, Vanessa Wharton, Sherry Butler, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Brief Opposing Motion to Consolidate)(Zummo, Rachel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of filing Courtesy Copy of Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to State Defendants Motion to Consolidate re: #22 Notice (Other),, by Rodney Bob, Theodore David, Cherry Lee Johnson, Angenitta Oaks, LaGladys Oliver-Davis, Port Arthur Community Action Network, Denise Swan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO STATE DEFENDANTS MOTON TO CONSOLIDATE, #2 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motions to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jones, Ashea)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of filing Courtesy Copy of Plaintiffs Brief in Opposition to Federal Defendants Motion to Consolidate re: #16 Notice (Other),, by Rodney Bob, Theodore David, Cherry Lee Johnson, Angenitta Oaks, LaGladys Oliver-Davis, Port Arthur Community Action Network, Denise Swan, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO FEDERAL DEFENDANTS MOTON TO CONSOLIDATE, #2 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motions to Consolidate, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Jones, Ashea)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development 2/5/2020; United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development 2/5/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 18, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Todd, James)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE Vacation Letter by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. (Lyles, Benjamin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Courtesy Copy of Mtn to Consolidate by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mtn to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit Prop Order)(Lyles, Benjamin)
December 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lyles, Benjamin)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to LR 7.6(B) of Courtesy Copy of Motion to Consolidate filed in Wharton, et al. v. U.S. Dep't of Hous. & Urban Devel., et al., No. 2:19-cv-300-DSM (S.D. Tex.) by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Courtesy Copy of Motion to Consolidate filed in 2:19-cv-300-DSM (S.D. Tex.), #2 Exhibit 2: Courtesy Copy of Proposed Order filed in 2:19-cv-300-DSM (S.D. Tex.))(Todd, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Related Action by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed. (Todd, James)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020, filed.(Jones, Ashea)
December 9, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development served on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020, filed.(Jones, Ashea)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed.(Todd, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Todd, Jr. on behalf of The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed. (Todd, James)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for James D. Todd, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for James D. Todd, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (Todd, James)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for State of Texas General Land Office 1/22/2020; Texas Land Commissioner 1/22/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint by State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lyles, Benjamin)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State of Texas General Land Office, Texas Land Commissioner, The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development, United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Secretary Ben Carson, #2 Proposed Summons Texas General Land Office, #3 Proposed Summons Texas Land Commissioner George P. Bush)(Jones, Ashea)
November 13, 2019 Summons Not Issued as to All Defendants Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies Summons not well formatted by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified. (ltien, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rodney Bob, Theodore David, Cherry Lee Johnson, Angenitta Oaks, LaGladys Oliver-Davis, Port Arthur Community Action Network, Denise Swan, filed.(Jones, Ashea)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Secretary Ben Carson, #2 Summons Texas General Land Office, #3 Summons Land Commissioner George P. Bush)(Jones, Ashea)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23529123) filed by Rodney Bob. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Ashea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bob et al v. U.S. Dept. of Housing and Urban Development et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaGladys Oliver-Davis
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Lee Johnson
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore David
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angenitta Oaks
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Arthur Community Action Network
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Swan
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Bob
Represented By: Martha Orozco
Represented By: Kimberly Brown Myles
Represented By: Michael M Daniel
Represented By: Laura B Beshara
Represented By: Ebony Jeanice Young
Represented By: Ashea Elizabeth Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Jones
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Butler
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wharton
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ortiz
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Zummo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Commissioner George P. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Secrety of HUD BEN CARSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Dept. of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas General Land Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: James D Todd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas General Land Office
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Secretary of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: James D Todd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Land Commissioner
Represented By: Benjamin Storey Lyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?