Unlimited Services, LLC v. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Plaintiff: Unlimited Services, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: National American Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc. and St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04414
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to National American Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Companies, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed.(Sammons, Mary)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed.(Sammons, Mary)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed.(Sammons, Mary)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 Other EXHIBITS re: #8 Amended Answer,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Chen, Florence)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against The Travelers Companies, Inc., National American Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, COUNTERCLAIM against Unlimited Services, LLC by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed. (Chen, Florence)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Unlimited Services, LLC by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sammons, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed.(Sammons, Mary)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Unlimited Services, LLC, filed.(Wojciechowski, Marc)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, filed.(Wojciechowski, Marc)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anadarko Petroleum Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23532498) filed by Unlimited Services, LLC.(Wojciechowski, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unlimited Services, LLC v. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Florence T Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unlimited Services, LLC
Represented By: Marc James Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: The Travelers Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?