Ford v. Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ford
Defendant: Blackstone Group Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04422
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Approval for electronic case filing by Larry D. Ford, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2019. (rhawkins)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss , filed.(Patton, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 APPENDIX re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/16/2019. (Patton, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint is extended through November 25, 2019..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Blackstone Group Inc., filed.(Patton, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Blackstone Group Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patton, Christopher)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District Court of Harris County Texas, case number 42019-66545 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23534095) filed by Blackstone Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Appendix Documents attached toIndex of Matters Being Filed)(Patton, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackstone Group Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?