America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC v. Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC
Defendant: Long Haul Trucking, Inc., Joe Thompson, Larry Fenimore, ASE Imaging Solutions, Inc. and Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04424
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 81
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC, filed.(Tittlebaum, Marc)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc M. Tittlebaum on behalf of Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC, filed. (Tittlebaum, Marc)
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ASE Imaging Solutions, Inc., filed.(Bradley, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Scott Bradley on behalf of ASE Imaging Solutions, Inc., filed. (Bradley, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by Long Haul Trucking, Inc.. (Henry, Vic)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, filed by America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walston, Clifford)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC.(Walston, Clifford)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 1/31/2020(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Long Haul Trucking, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Henry, Vic)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vic Houston Henry on behalf of Long Haul Trucking, Inc., filed. (Henry, Vic)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 284th District Court of Montgomery County, Texas, case number 19-05-06094 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23535406) filed by Long Haul Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of All Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit A - Delivery Receipt, #3 Exhibit B - Standard Form for Presentation of Loss and Damage Claims, #4 Exhibit C - List of Counsel, #5 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #7 Exhibit F - Return of Service for UBS, #8 Exhibit G - UBS' Original Answer, #9 Exhibit H - Return of Service for ASE, #10 Exhibit I - ASE's Original Answer, #11 Exhibit J - Docket Control Order, #12 Exhibit K - First Amended Cross Petition, #13 Exhibit L - Returned Green Card for Thompson, #14 Exhibit M - ASE's Counterclaim, #15 Exhibit N - Plaintiff's First Amended Petition, #16 Exhibit O - Citation for Thompson, #17 Exhibit P - Citation for Fenimore, #18 Exhibit Q - Citation for Long Haul Trucking, #19 Exhibit R - Notice of Appearance of Bradley, #20 Exhibit S - Return of Service for Long Haul Trucking, #21 Exhibit T - Return of Service for Fenimore, #22 Exhibit U - Amended Docket Control Order, #23 Exhibit V - Order Granting Motion for Continuance of Trial Date, #24 Exhibit W - UBS' Original Answer, #25 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hubbard, Emileigh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC v. Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Haul Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Vic Houston Henry
Represented By: Emileigh Stewart Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Fenimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASE Imaging Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Alan Kalis
Represented By: Brian Scott Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultimate Biomedical Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Marc Moramon Tittlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: America's ER Site 002 Imaging and Lab, LLC
Represented By: Clifford Hugh Walston
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Bowlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?