Casanova v. City of La Joya, TX
Plaintiff: Isidro Casanova
Defendant: City of La Joya, TX
Case Number: 4:2019cv04463
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Voluntarily by City of La Joya, TX, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal)(Salinas, Kennedy)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hidalgo County Court No. 6, case number CL-19-5704-F (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23556641) filed by City of La Joya, TX. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through F)(Salinas, Kennedy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casanova v. City of La Joya, TX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Casanova
Represented By: Roberto Jackson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of La Joya, TX
Represented By: Kennedy Felix Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?