Cooper et al v. Detail Garage, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Donald Cooper and Detail Capital, LLC
Defendant: Chad Zani and Detail Garage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04501
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Referring Judge: Dena Hanovice Palermo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 9/1/20 (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - THIS MATTER comes before the Court on the Parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, which requests dismissal with prejudice. Upon due consideration, therefore, this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with the Court retaining continuing jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the terms of the Settlement Agreement....*** Case terminated on 9/1/20. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 29, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Motions referred to Dena Hanovice Palermo. by Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2020. (Kirklin, Paul)
June 4, 2020 Filing 22 First AMENDED ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Detail Garage, LLC, filed. (Hendershot, Simon)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 29, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Detail Garage, LLC. (Hendershot, Simon)
May 22, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Claims, filed by Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Kirklin, Paul)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Claims by Detail Garage, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hendershot, Simon)
April 17, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC filed by Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC.(Kirklin, Paul)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, filed by Detail Garage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendershot, Simon)
April 3, 2020 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kirklin, Paul)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Detail Garage's responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production are due one week following the signing of this Order..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Requests for Production by Detail Garage, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Unsworn Declaration of Alyssa E. Schaffer, #2 Proposed Order)(Hendershot, Simon)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULING AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2020 Pltf Expert Report due by 7/15/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 9/17/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/14/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/14/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2021. Jury Trial set for 2/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Keith P Ellison(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 2 days. Jury. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2020 Pltf Expert Report due by 7/15/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 8/12/2020. Discovery due by 9/17/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/14/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/14/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER , filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donald Cooper, Detail Capital, LLC, filed.(Kirklin, Paul)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Detail Garage, LLC, filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Detail Garage, LLC, filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Detail Garage, LLC, filed.(Hendershot, Simon)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-76784 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23573880) filed by Detail Garage, LLC, Chad Zani. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice Email, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal-State Court, #5 Exhibit Harris County Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Request for Service-Detail Garage, #7 Exhibit Request for Service-Chad Zani, #8 Exhibit List of Counsel/Parties)(Hendershot, Simon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Detail Garage, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cooper
Represented By: Paul Stephen Kirklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detail Capital, LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Kirklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Zani
Represented By: Simon W Hendershot, III
Represented By: Benjamin Lowell Hisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detail Garage, LLC
Represented By: Simon W Hendershot, III
Represented By: Benjamin Lowell Hisey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?