Tolbert v. Stroud et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Keith Tolbert
Defendant: Jason Warren, Stephanie Stroud and Stephen Cole
Case Number: 4:2019cv04539
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified. (wbostic, 4)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Shannon Keith Tolbert, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shannon Keith Tolbert, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Shannon Keith Tolbert. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 12/23/2019, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shannon Keith Tolbert, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/9/2019. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Shannon Keith Tolbert.(MelissaMorgan, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolbert v. Stroud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Keith Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?