DISH Network L.L.C. v. DOES 1-15
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Defendant: DOES 1-15, d/b/a Freetvall.com, Freetvall.net, Freetvall.xyz, Freetvall.me, Freetvall.live, Livetvcafe.com, Livetvcafe.net, Livetvcafe.me, Time4tv.com, Time4tv.net, Time4tv.me, Cricket-tv.net, Cricket and DOES 1-15
Case Number: 4:2019cv04563
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Expedite.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 2/28/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by DISH Network L.L.C., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedite Discovery, #2 Declaration of Michael Schwimmer, #3 Declaration of Gergory Duval, #4 Exhibits 1-5 to Duval Declaration, #5 Declaration of Stephen Ferguson, #6 Exhibits 1-7 to Ferguson Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DISH Network L.L.C., filed.(Ferguson, Stephen)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-15, d/b/a Freetvall.com, Freetvall.net, Freetvall.xyz, Freetvall.me, Freetvall.live, Livetvcafe.com, Livetvcafe.net, Livetvcafe.me, Time4tv.com, Time4tv.net, Time4tv.me, Cricket-tv.net, Cricket (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23616331) filed by DISH Network L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-4 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferguson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DISH Network L.L.C. v. DOES 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISH Network L.L.C.
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-15, d/b/a Freetvall.com, Freetvall.net, Freetvall.xyz, Freetvall.me, Freetvall.live, Livetvcafe.com, Livetvcafe.net, Livetvcafe.me, Time4tv.com, Time4tv.net, Time4tv.me, Cricket-tv.net, Cricket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?