Lopez et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Hilda Lopez and Arnold Lopez
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04580
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Conference reset for 1/24/2020 at 11:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Resetting Conference terminating #5 . Initial Conference reset for 1/24/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Reset December 13, 2019 Pretrial Conference by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Joint Motion to Reset)(Yow, Rebecca)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order: Initial Conference set for 12/13/2019 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 190th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-74703 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23624558) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Lopez
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Lopez
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?