Lawson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU et al
Plaintiff: Angela Lawson
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04746
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney Anthony Laurent Laporte terminated.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed PROPOSED ORDER re: #11 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis, filed.(Laporte, Anthony)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU, filed.(Hytken, Rachel)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony L. Laporte on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU, filed. (Laporte, Anthony)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, filed.(Hytken, Rachel)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Angela Lawson, filed.(Lane, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Lawson, filed.(Lane, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time Answer due by 1/3/2020.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hytken, Rachel)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU, filed.(Hytken, Rachel)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th District Court, Harris Co., TX, case number 2019-82387 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23710356) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Lawson
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Represented By: Alexander James Hefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. fka WAMU
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rachel L Hytken
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rachel L Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?