Perry v. Christian, et al
Plaintiff: Lee Perry
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, Wayne Christian, David A Scott, Hilcorp Energy Company, Michael Sommers, Marathon Oil Company, American Petroleum Institute, Sonny Purdue, Rhonda Hamilton, ConocoPhillips Corporation, Ryan Lance and Greg Lalicker
Interested Party: Larry Johnson, LaToya Thorne, Taurus K. Dearman, Patience Witchet, Gwendalyn Doughty, Bridgitteh Thorns, John C. Perry, Latonya R. Thorns-Dearman, Francis Ray Hardy, Cleveland Earl Sims, II and Faith Mitchell
Case Number: 4:2019cv04757
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to #16 MOTION to Join Case as a Plaintiff, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Dearman Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Dearman)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION to Join Case as a Plaintiff, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Patience Witchet Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Patience Witchet)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to #18 MOTION for LaToya Thorne to be Part of Case No. 4-19-cv-4757, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A LaToya Thorns Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order LaToya Thorns)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #14 Document , filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Larry Johnson Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Larry Johnson)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION for Joinder, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Francis Hardy Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Francis Hardy)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION to become a party in this case, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Faith Mitchell Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Faith Mitchell)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #13 Document , filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Cleveland Sims Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Cleveland Sims)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition to #17 MOTION added to the case, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Bridgitte Thorns Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Bridgitte Thorns)(Stahl, Craig)
February 3, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #19 Certificate of Interested Parties , filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Alfonso Watts Intervention Ltr, #2 Proposed Order Alfonso Watts)(Stahl, Craig)
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Join Case as a Plaintiff by Patience Witchet, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (jdav, 4)
January 27, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION Join case as plaintiff, filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falick, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION Join case as plaintiff filed by American Petroleum Institute. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falick, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION Join case as plaintiff, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Doughty's Intervention Letter), #2 Proposed Order Denying Doughty's Intervention)(Stahl, Craig)
January 27, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION Join case as plaintiff, filed by ConocoPhillips Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Perry's Intervention Letter), #2 Proposed Order Denying Perry's Intervention)(Stahl, Craig)
January 27, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss #12 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by ConocoPhillips Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Stahl, Craig)
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Join Case as a Plaintiff by Francis Ray Hardy, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
January 24, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for LaToya Thorne to be Part of Case No. 4-19-cv-4757 by LaToya Thorne, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2020. (jguajardo, 4)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Bridgitteh Thorns to be Part of Case No. 4:19-cv-4757 by Bridgitteh Thorns, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2020. (jguajardo, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alfonso Watts, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Join Case as a Plaintiff by Taurus K. Dearman, Latonya R. Thorns-Dearman, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4)
January 16, 2020 Filing 15 Additional CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiff, filed.(mmapps, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 Complaint in addition to plaintiff Lee Perry by Larry Johnson, filed.(jdav, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 Complaint in addition to plaintiff Lee Perry by Cleveland Earl Sims, II, filed.(jdav, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lee Perry. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Lee Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mmapps, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to become a party in this case by Faith Mitchell, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2020. (jdav, 4)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Ryan Lance, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Ryan Lance)(Stahl, Craig)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Join case as plaintiff by Gwendalyn Doughty, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION Join case as plaintiff by John C. Perry, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2020. (JenniferOlson, 4)
January 4, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by American Petroleum Institute, filed.(Falick, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Petroleum Institute, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falick, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips Corporation, filed.(Kuehnle, Jeffrey)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by ConocoPhillips Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Stahl, Craig)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES, filed.(ckrus, 4)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lee Perry.(jdav, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU09744, filed. (jdav, 4)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Christian, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilcorp Energy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Michael Charles Falick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Purdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Todd Kuehnle
Represented By: Craig L Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lance
Represented By: Craig L Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Lalicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Larry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LaToya Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Taurus K. Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Patience Witchet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Gwendalyn Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bridgitteh Thorns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John C. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Latonya R. Thorns-Dearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Francis Ray Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Cleveland Earl Sims, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Faith Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?