Nguyen v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Thu-Thuy Nguyen
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04774
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edwards, Christine)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Thu-Thuy Nguyen, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/5/2020. (Nguyen, Thanh)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Edwards, Christine)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Edwards, Christine)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court, case number 2019-58106 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23725386) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Items Filed, #2 List of Parties and Counsel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edwards, Christine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thu-Thuy Nguyen
Represented By: Johnny Nguyen
Represented By: Thanh Hoang Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Christine Reifschneider Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?