Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., San Angelo Hospital, L.P., Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Victoria of Texas LP, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, ARMC, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, The Hospitals of Providence, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Cedar Park Health System, L.P., VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Longview Medical Center, L.P., Granbury Hospital Corporation, Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P. doing business as Brownwood Regional Medical Center, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P. doing business as Laredo Medical Center, The Hospitals of Providence Memorial Campus, NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc. doing business as Hill Regional Hospital, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P. doing business as Woodland Heights Medical Center, Palo Pinto General Hospital, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC doing business as Baptist Medical Center doing business as Mission Trail Baptist Hospital doing business as North Central Baptist Hospital doing business as Northeast Baptist Hospital doing business as St. Luke's Baptist, Navarro Hospital, L.P. doing business as Navarro Regional Hospital, Guadalupe Regional Medical Center, ARMC, L.P. doing business as Abilene Regional Medical Center, The Hospitals of Providence East Campus, The Hospitals of Providence Sierra Campus, The Hospitals of Providence Transmountain Campus, VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Valley Baptist Medical Center, Victoria of Texas LP doing business as Detar Hospital Navarro doing business as Detar Hospital North, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C. doing business as Valley Baptist Medical Center - Brownsville, Resolute Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Resolute Health, San Angelo Hospital, L.P. doing business as San Angelo Community Medical Center, Cedar Park Health System, L.P. doing business as Cedar Park Regional Medical Caneter, Granbury Hospital Corporation doing business as Lake Granbury Medical Center, Dallas County Hospital District doing business as Parkland Health & Hospital System and Longview Medical Center, L.P. doing business as Longview Regional Medical Center
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Nicolas Padron, MD, Mallinckrodt PLC, Henry Schein, Inc., Allergan PLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Anda, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Theodore Okechuku, MD, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Wholesale Drug Co., Richard Andrews, MD, Walgreens Co., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, H.D. Smith, LLC, Walmart Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Carlos Luis Venegas, MD, CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, SpecGX LLC, Noramco, Inc., John Does 1 to 100, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Walgreen Co, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co, Depomed, Theodore Okechuku, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Carlos Luis Venegas, Richard Andrews, Nicolas Padron, Watson Pharma, Inc. and Actavis Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv04834
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
March 30, 2020 Filing 52 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying #48 Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
March 5, 2020 Filing 50 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 4, 2020 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition to #48 MOTION for Reconsideration of #47 Memorandum and Order, filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Weinstein, David)
February 12, 2020 Filing 48 MOTION for Reconsideration of #47 Memorandum and Order by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Burns, Warren)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
January 24, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority In Support of Emergency Motion to Remand re: #5 MOTION to Remand by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burns, Warren)
January 17, 2020 Filing 45 Corrected CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed.(Burns, Warren)
January 17, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed.(Burns, Warren)( Filed in error and will refile) Modified on 1/17/2020 (mmapps, 4).
January 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/16/2020. Argument heard on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand #5 , Plaintiffs Motion to Strike #6 , and Defendants Motion to Stay #34 . The Motion to Strike #6 is DENIED. The Court takes the Motion to Remand and the Motion to Stay under advisement. Appearances:Harry Yeton, Matthew Coveler, Zona Jones, Brandan Montminy. Warren Tavares Burns, Darren Patrick Nicholson, Conor B. O'Croinin, Asher Benjamin Griffin.(Court Reporter: K. Metzger)(Law Clerk: K. Schiffman), filed.(arrivera, 4)
January 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 1/16/2020. Argument heard on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand #5 , Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike #6 , and Defendants' Motion to Stay #34 . The Motion to Strike #6 is DENIED. The Court takes the Motion to Remand and Motion to Stay under advisement. Appearances: Warren Tavares Burns, Darren Patrick Nicholson, Gene M Jones, II, Conor B. O'Croinin, Michael W Mengis, Lucas C. Wohlford, Stephen Edward McConnico, Elizabeth Weaver Scofield.(Court Reporter: Kathy Metzger)(Law Clerk: K. Schiffman), filed.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
January 16, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Smith on behalf of Walmart Inc., filed. (Smith, David)
January 15, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Setting as to #34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, #5 MOTION to Remand, #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Remand, filed by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP. (Burns, Warren)
January 14, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Lydia Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
January 8, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Lydia A. Wright to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2020. (Burns, Warren)
January 6, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Takoma Stay Order, #2 Exhibit 2-Noble Stay Order, #3 Exhibit 3-Lungstrom Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4-Osage Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 5-City of Jenks Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6-Polster Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David)
January 3, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Motions hearing cancelled. (arrivera, 4)
January 3, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo in Support of CVS's Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit 1-Rockwall County Order, #3 Exhibit 2-Walker County Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 3-Ellis County Stay Order, #5 Exhibit 4-Duval County Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 5-Jim Hogg County Stay Order, #7 Exhibit 6-Jim Wells County Stay Order, #8 Exhibit 7-Williamson County Stay Order, #9 Exhibit 8-Angelina County Stay Order, #10 Exhibit 9-CTO 128, #11 Exhibit 10-List of Fed Question Removed Cases, #12 Exhibit 11-Johnson County Remand Order, #13 Exhibit 12-Fire and Police Remand Order, #14 Exhibit 13-Commonwealth of Kentucky Order)(Weinstein, David)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Conor B. O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
January 2, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Conor Brendan O'Croinin to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attachment to Motion and Order, #2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Maryland, #3 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing Pennsylvania)(Weinstein, David)
December 31, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Setting as to #5 MOTION to Remand, #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
December 30, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY in Support of #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, , filed by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP. (Burns, Warren)
December 30, 2019 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Johnson & Johnson as Corporate Parent, filed.(Griffin, Asher)
December 30, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AmerisourceBergen Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles)
December 30, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SpecGX LLC, filed.(McCleary, Roger)
December 30, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah)
December 27, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, filed.(Weinstein, David)
December 27, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc., filed.(Scofield, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Henry Schein, Inc., filed.(McDonald, John)
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Noramco, Inc., filed.(Durfee, Matthew)
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, , filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike)(Weinstein, David)
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed.(Schell, Russell)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Amneal Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (entitled "Plaintiffs' Original Petition, Jury Demand, and Rule 194.2 Request for Disclosure") is extended to and including sixty (60) days from the later of: ( 1) entry of an order by the JPML transferring this case to the Opiate MDL ( Case NO. 2804 ); or (2) entry of an order with this Court's ruling on any motion to remand..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Patterson, Nancy)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Answer Complaint by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order-Amneal Mtn)(Schell, Russell)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H.D. Smith, LLC, filed.(Wohlford, Lucas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION re: Dismissal Without Prejudice by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed.(Burns, Warren)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Petition by Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patterson, Nancy)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer or response to Plaintiff's complaint is extending 60 days from the later of entry of an order by the JPML transferring of this case, or an order with this Court's ruling on any motion to remand..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time; and #11 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition is extended 60 days following a final decision by the JPML or transfer..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Response to Complaint by Henry Schein, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, John)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Smyser, Craig)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to the Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, SpecGX LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Raley, Matthew)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co., Walmart Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension)(Scofield, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,, by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by ARMC, L.P., Brownwood Hospital, L.P., Cedar Park Health System, L.P., College Station Hospital L P, Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital, Granbury Hospital Corporation, Guadalupe Valley Hospital, Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P., Longview Medical Center, L.P., NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc., Nacogdoches Medical Center, Navarro Hospital, L.P., Palo Pinto County Hospital District, Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P., Resolute Hospital Company, LLC, San Angelo Hospital, L.P., The Hospitals of Providence, VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C., VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC, VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC, Victoria of Texas LP, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Burns, Warren)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for H.D. Smith, LLC 60 days following the later of: (I) final decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) or transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL or (ii) this Court's ruling on any motion to remand, whichever is later..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Response to Complaint by H.D. Smith, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wohlford, Lucas)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd JD Harris County MDL, case number 2019-85177 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23756439) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B-Civil Case Info Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Plaintiffs 1st Amd Petition, #4 Exhibit D-Plaintiffs Req for Citation, #5 Exhibit E-Plaintiffs Notice of Related Cases, #6 Exhibit F-Citations, #7 Exhibit G-Notice of Tag Along, #8 Exhibit H-Appdx A, #9 Exhibit I-Appdx B, #10 Exhibit J-Appdx C, #11 Exhibit K-Appdx D, #12 Exhibit L-Appdx E, #13 Exhibit M-Appdx F, #14 Exhibit N-Dallas County Docket Sheet, #15 Exhibit O-Harris County Docket Sheet, #16 Exhibit P-All Counsel of Record, #17 Exhibit Q-Executed Citation - Mallinckrodt, #18 Exhibit R-Executed Citation - Abbott Lab, #19 Exhibit S-Executed Citation - Anda Inc., #20 Exhibit T-Executed Citation - Mallinckrodt, #21 Exhibit U-Executed Citation - Ortho-McNeil, #22 Exhibit V-Executed Citation - Abbott Lab, #23 Exhibit W-Executed Citation - Actavis Pharma, #24 Exhibit X-Executed Citation - Walmart, #25 Exhibit Y-Executed Citation - Janssen Pharma, #26 Exhibit Z-Executed Citation - HD Smith, #27 Exhibit AA-Executed Citation - Endo Pharma, #28 Exhibit BB-Executed Citation - CVS Pharmacy, #29 Exhibit CC-Executed Citation - Janssen Pharma, #30 Exhibit DD-Janssen Answer, #31 Exhibit EE-Cardinal Health Answer, #32 Exhibit FF-Amerisource Answer, #33 Exhibit GG-Actavis and Watson Answer, #34 Exhibit HH-Cephalon Answer, #35 Exhibit II-Teva Pharm Answer, #36 Exhibit JJ-Noramco Answer)(Weinstein, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Craig Smyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Represented By: Jeffrey Roger Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Padron, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: John P McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Okechuku, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: James G Martingano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Drug Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: Lucas C. Wohlford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Represented By: David S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Represented By: Michael Halley Bernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Luis Venegas, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: David Bruce Weinstein
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc
Represented By: David Bruce Weinstein
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Roger L McCleary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A Durfee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Russell W Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. F/K/A Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Asher Benjamin Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Represented By: Elizabeth Weaver Scofield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co
Represented By: Lucas C. Wohlford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed
Represented By: Kevin M Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Okechuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Luis Venegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolas Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Nancy Lynne Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Angelo Hospital, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria of Texas LP
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Valley Hospital
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMC, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: College Station Hospital L P
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospitals of Providence
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Park Health System, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nacogdoches Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas County Hospital District - Parkland Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longview Medical Center, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granbury Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brownwood Hospital, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute Hospital Company, LLC
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palo Pinto County Hospital District
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navarro Hospital, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P.
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brownwood Hospital, L.P. doing business as Brownwood Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laredo Texas Hospital Company, L.P. doing business as Laredo Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospitals of Providence Memorial Campus
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NHCI of Hillsboro, Inc. doing business as Hill Regional Hospital
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piney Woods Healthcare System, L.P. doing business as Woodland Heights Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palo Pinto General Hospital
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS San Antonio Partners, LLC doing business as Baptist Medical Center doing business as Mission Trail Baptist Hospital doing business as North Central Baptist Hospital doing business as Northeast Baptist Hospital doing business as St. Luke's Baptist
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navarro Hospital, L.P. doing business as Navarro Regional Hospital
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMC, L.P. doing business as Abilene Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospitals of Providence East Campus
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospitals of Providence Sierra Campus
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hospitals of Providence Transmountain Campus
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS Harlingen Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Valley Baptist Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria of Texas LP doing business as Detar Hospital Navarro doing business as Detar Hospital North
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VHS Brownsville Hospital Company, L.L.C. doing business as Valley Baptist Medical Center - Brownsville
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Resolute Hospital Company, LLC doing business as Resolute Health
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Angelo Hospital, L.P. doing business as San Angelo Community Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedar Park Health System, L.P. doing business as Cedar Park Regional Medical Caneter
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granbury Hospital Corporation doing business as Lake Granbury Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas County Hospital District doing business as Parkland Health & Hospital System
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Longview Medical Center, L.P. doing business as Longview Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Lydia A Wright
Represented By: Darren Patrick Nicholson
Represented By: William Bennett Thompson
Represented By: Warren Tavares Burns
Represented By: Gene M Jones, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?