Jones v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Guy Jones
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Michael Boone
Case Number: 4:2019cv04850
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Guy Jones, filed. (Wilson, Chad)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Guy Jones, filed.(Wilson, Chad)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying The Travelers Companies, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Burke, Melinda)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Judicial Disctrict Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-81439 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23759673) filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Jones
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Amanda Jean Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda Ruth Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?