Hamedi et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Mohammad Bagher Hamedi and Behnaz Dowlathahi
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04868
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 A Exhibits, #2 B, C, D Exhibits, #3 Proposed Order)(Gottlieb, Aaron)
January 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G, #2 Proposed Order)(Gottlieb, Aaron)
January 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Management ORDER. By 2/14/2020, JPMorgan Chase may move to dismiss this case, and move for summary judgment. By 3/15/2020, the plaintiffs may respond. Internal review set for 3/16/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for INITIAL CONFERENCE held before Judge Lynn N Hughes on 1/9/2020. Order to be entered. Appearances: Mohammad Bagher Hamedi, Behnaz Dowlathahi, Aaron Gottlieb. (Court Reporter: J. Sanchez) (ghassan, 4)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance Re Initial Disclosures by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed. (Gottlieb, Aaron)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: Initial Conference set for 1/9/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.; Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Danner, R)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., filed.(Danner, R)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Civil Court at Law No. 2, case number 1145819 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23770842) filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - CAD Detail, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Danner, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamedi et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Aaron B Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: R Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Aaron B Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammad Bagher Hamedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behnaz Dowlathahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?