Corliss et al v. Amegy Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Vivian R. Corliss and Clifford Shane Corliss
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Amegy Bank National Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04888
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 3/27/2020(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 6, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint by Clifford Shane Corliss, Vivian R. Corliss, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit 2011 Hometrust, #3 Exhibit 2015 HS Lien, #4 Exhibit 2016 DOT, #5 Exhibit Refinancing Statement, #6 Exhibit Title Paperwork, #7 Exhibit 2011 Lien Report, #8 Exhibit NTC Letter for FM, #9 Exhibit USPS Tracking FM, #10 Exhibit NTC Letter for Amegy, #11 Exhibit USPS Tracking Amegy, #12 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT)(Lane, Robert)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. (Yow, Rebecca)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT Concerning Removal by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yow, Rebecca)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 164th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-82909 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23781976) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corliss et al v. Amegy Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zions Bancorporation, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amegy Bank National Association
Represented By: Carlton Dalbey Wilde, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian R. Corliss
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Shane Corliss
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?