Plante et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Plante and Karen Plante
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04954
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney Anthony Laporte.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney Anthony Laporte. Attorney William Lance Lewis and Rebecca Kendall Yow terminated. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED ANSWER to, COUNTERCLAIM against Karen Plante, Ronald Plante by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. (Lewis, William)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Karen Plante, Ronald Plante, filed.(Lane, Robert)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Karen Plante, Ronald Plante, filed.(Lane, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 234th Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2019-83312 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23814018) filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plante et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Plante
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Plante
Represented By: Tyler Lee Basham
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?