County of Harris, Texas v. Eli Lilly And Company et al
Plaintiff: County of Harris, Texas
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark Texas Mail Pharmacy, LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Caremark, LLC, Optum, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., Novo Nordisk, Inc., Aetna Pharmacy Management Services, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Eli Lilly And Company and OptumRX Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04994
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Harris County, Texas filed by Harris County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(George, William)
January 31, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Novo Nordisk, Inc. identifying Novo Nordisk A/S as Corporate Parent, filed.(Christian, Randall)
January 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall L. Christian on behalf of Novo Nordisk, Inc., filed. (Christian, Randall)
January 31, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION re: Service and Setting Time for Responding to the Complaint by Harris County, Texas, filed.(George, William)
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for John M. Snyder to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John M. Snyder)(Vandenbout, Justin)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Emily C. McGowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Emily C. McGowan)(Vandenbout, Justin)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Brian D. Boone to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Brian D. Boone)(Vandenbout, Justin)
January 17, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aetna Pharmacy Management Services, LLC, Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark Texas Mail Pharmacy, LLC, Caremark, LLC, filed.(Veselka, Larry)
January 17, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for R. Brendan Fee to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of R. Brendan Fee re Local Rules of SDTX and Judge's Procedures)(Carter, Winstol)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Patrick A. Harvey to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick A. Harvey re Local Rules of SDTX and Judge's Procedures)(Carter, Winstol)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Jason R. Scherr to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason R. Scherr re Local Rules of SDTX and Judge's Procedures)(Carter, Winstol)
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Optum, Inc., OptumRX Inc., filed.(Hatchett, David)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, filed.(Hughes, Alexander)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eli Lilly And Company, filed.(Callahan, Bryce)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc., filed.(Carter, Winstol)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by County of Harris, Texas, filed.(George, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT Defendants' Statement Pursuant to the Court's Order in Removed Cases re: #2 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by Eli Lilly And Company, filed.(Callahan, Bryce)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Eli Lilly And Company, filed.(Callahan, Bryce)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District Court, case number 2019-83863 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23830350) filed by Eli Lilly And Company. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Callahan, Bryce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Harris, Texas v. Eli Lilly And Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Texas Mail Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Hatchett
Represented By: Andrew Hatchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk, Inc.
Represented By: Randall L Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Pharmacy Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Winstol Dean Carter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Rx Home Delivery, LLC
Represented By: Larry Richard Veselka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Joshua Fuchs
Represented By: Alexander Giomi Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly And Company
Represented By: Bryce Lee Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX Inc.
Represented By: David Andrew Hatchett
Represented By: Andrew Hatchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Harris, Texas
Represented By: William David George
Represented By: Joanne Cicala Inscore
Represented By: Vincent Reed Ryan, Jr
Represented By: Debra Tsuchiyama Baker
Represented By: Christopher George Hollins
Represented By: Richard Martin Schechter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?