Ford v. American Homes 4 Rent Management Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ford
Defendant: American Homes 4 Rent Management Holdings, LLC and American Homes 4 Rent
Case Number: 4:2020cv00063
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by American Homes 4 Rent, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A, #2 Appendix Appendix, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Mtn)(Levine, Mark)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Homes 4 Rent, filed.(Levine, Mark)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Harris County District, case number 2019-66470 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23905323) filed by American Homes 4 Rent Management Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Levine, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. American Homes 4 Rent Management Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Homes 4 Rent Management Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Homes 4 Rent
Represented By: Mark J Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?