Acklin et al v. Express Courier International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Vogt, Mario Jackson, Jerry Wilson, Ann Williams, Pamela Dulin, Mary Banks, Antony Mitchell, Derrick Schofield, Liliana Nikolic, Benneth Wilson, Brenda Brown, John Eric Cheney, Shameka Brown, Frederick Holliday, Paige Acklin, Steve Barnett, Amber Cowsert, Jerry Horowitz, Homer Crawford, Ronnie Ross, John Eldridge, Stephen Brodien, Mary Bogan, Ivy Flowers, Jamie Holloman, Sirlina Barnes, George Dillard, III, Valerica Gafencu, David Mallery, Steven Teston, Kalifa Jaiteh, William Smith, Jason Mercado, Austin Tudeme, George Lee, III, Erica McWilliams, Carlis Taylor, J.D. Dohnal, Ronald Holt, Brian Coleman, Kawana Patterson, David Shinn, Clarence Williams, Maggie L. Dean, Timothy Russell, Corry Knowles, Friday Ulumenfo, Penny Rearden, Jamille Watts, Sheri Bell, Roy Walton, Tauris L. Yates, Michael J. Lewis, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Michael Rearden, Billy Taylor, Julie Ewell, French Moore, Leanne Brown, Maurice Laster, Dean Ennis, Michael McDonald, Sr., Rosheka Douglas, Myron Davis, Tiffany Smith, Darrell Carpenter, James Butler, Michael Taylor, Steve Petty, Roger Stephens, Khalid AlSaadun, William Royals, Joyce Puff, Larry Sullivan, Iris Lucas, Glen Crawford, Michael Bennett, Donald Hash, Dirk McVicker, Jason Calvin, Oscar Love, Brian Traughber, Robinson Mwangi, Cheryl McNeal, Paul Stewart, Rena Jeffries, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Brenda Askew, Melissa Caldwell, Brian Pirtle, Shelbi Bond, Charlotte Ball, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Putnam, Tammy Watkins, Bonnie Puff, Seneca Otey, Cynthia Walker, Leslie McNish, Willie Fasolo, Steve Butzer, Larry Perkins, Johnathan Gooden, John Newman, Willie Reynolds, Terrance Boyd, Diane Towns, Kevin Montgomery, Elmo Kieloch, Turpin Smith, Ronnie Holden, Michael Morrison, Michael Nicoletti, Kelsey Robinson, Ahmed Alani, Kim Smith, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Simmons, III, Crystal Sanderson, Gary Shields, Roy Robinson, Cal Colbenson, Lester L. Steinback, Patrick K. Johnson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Henry Miller, Joe Augusta, Jr., Marius Easley, Thomas M. Hermes, Javonna Webb, John Walker, Brian Drake, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Andrew Anderson, Ruby Lane, Vicki Stafford, Shelby Capelli, James Gallahan, Lakeshea Moss, Bobby Goforth, Tim Knight, Margaret Telford, Raymond Clay, Judy Rogers, Eddie Collins, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Flora Gonzalez, Jose Martinez, Charles Blevins, Margaret Italia, April Martinez, Jimmy White, Carl Martin, Nikia F. Payne, Curtis Overbay, Meredith Coomer, Mitch Bingham, DeShun Flowers, Jeffrey Grey, Tony Finch, Rodney Thomas, David Crain, Daniel Thomas, Khorri Slaughter, Viva Hoover, William McElroy, Anna Sutter, William Billups, Tameka Patton, Jeremy N. Cox, Gary Frye, Alexander Smith, Martin Brychta, William Dulin, Jennifer Gaudet, Debra Hale, Jose Dominguez, Dana Swailes, Larry DeWeese, Wyndel Walker, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Jim A. DuCharme, Mary Wilson, Norman Morgan, Joseph Crisco, Micquan Ferguson, Ashley Morgan, Claude Poore, Jr., Derek Everett, Sabrina Benton, Kaiser Powell, Richard Harris, Bud Barnett, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Coleman, Gary Bell, Raimundo Ferrer, Ambrose Jones, Vivian Briggs, Thomas Hubbard, Steven Cook, David Walters, Dr. James Johnson, Amy Whitworth, Don Starks, Michael L. Adkison, Anthony Sanford, Tracy Bond, Carey Mitchell, David Rathbone, Mohsen Ramsis, Quania Johnson, Sean Burns, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Tyrone Scott, Paul Dodson, Doyle McGlamery, Linda McConnell, Joan Dowell, Jeremy Davidson, Danny Muse, Thomas Morgan, Brian D. Cole, Charles Russell, Gerald Mann, Joshua Matt Daniels, Glenda Dotson, Kelly Vaughn, Michael Blassingame, Corik Anderson, Cheryl Drake, Sharika Ostine, Kristopher Ferguson, Allen Wafer, Tonya Ricketts, Steve Acuff, Jason Higgins, Drana R. Fields, Burl Ferguson, Jennifer Beard, Richard Williams, Takeshia Clark, Tim Coradini, III and Harold Hamstra
Defendant: EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00162
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc., filed.(Quillen, Emily)
January 31, 2020 Filing 82 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Jesse D. Nelson as to Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff re: #81 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (RTS; Insufficient Address, UTF)(sguevara, 4)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(JenniferOlson, 4)
January 16, 2020 Filing 80 Case transferred in from Tennessee Middle. Case Number 3:18-cv-00028; received electronically
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: The Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to Finalize Settlement (Doc. No. 78) is GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, for further proceedings and then to close the file. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/14/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
January 13, 2020 Filing 78 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to Finalize Settlement by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: In light of the pending settlement and the stay entered in this case (Doc. Nos. 55 and 72), the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 27) is DENIED without prejudice as moot. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 12/20/2019. (jw)
December 16, 2019 Filing 76 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
November 18, 2019 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 74 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: In light of the pending settlement and the stay entered in this case (Doc. Nos. 55 and 72), the pretrial conference set for November 8, 2019, and the jury trial set for November 19, 2019 (Doc. No. 44) are canceled. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 9/26/2019. (jw)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: The motion is GRANTED and this action remains STAYED pending the filing of the parties' next joint status report. The Court takes notice that the parties anticipate finalizing the terms of settlement within 60 days and moving to transfer this action shortly thereafter. The next status report shall state progress within that timeframe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 9/17/2019. (jw)
September 17, 2019 Filing 71 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER: This matter remains STAYED pending the parties' next status update. That filing shall include a projected timeline for the finalizing of settlement terms and the filing of a motion to transfer this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/20/2019. (jw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 69 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE#68 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, Certificates of Service shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel did not include a certificate of service. Please FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document. (jw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 68 STATUS REPORT by Paige Acklin. (West, Joshua)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER: The claims of the following Plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice: William Billups, Charles Blevins, Eddie Collins, Amber Cowsert, Myron Davis, George Dillard III, Paul Dodson, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Dean Ennis, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Deshun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Valerica Gafencu, Bobby Goforth, Jerry Harper, Jr., Jamie Holloman, Viva Hoover, April Martinez, Doyle McGlamery, Leslie McNish, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Claude Poore, Jr., David Rathbone, Anthony Sanford, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Billy Taylor, Austin Tudeme, and David Walters. The following claims are also DISMISSED with prejudice: all claims made by Mitchell Bingham in this lawsuit for wages up to May 1, 2015, all claims made by Dieufrant Dodorlye in this lawsuit for wages up to July 10, 2016, all claims made by Jennifer Gaudet in this lawsuit for wages up to March 9, 2016, all claims made by Michael J. Lewis in this lawsuit for wages up to March 29, 2014, and all claims made by Liliana Nicolic in this lawsuit for wages up to May 22, 2016. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 8/12/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 66 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of Separate Plaintiffs by William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Charles Blevins, Eddie Collins, Amber Cowsert, Myron Davis, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Dean Ennis, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Valerica Gafencu, Jennifer Gaudet, Bobby Goforth, Jerry Harper, Jr., Jamie Holloman, Viva Hoover, Michael J. Lewis, April Martinez, Doyle McGlamery, Leslie McNish, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Liliana Nikolic, Claude Poore, Jr., David Rathbone, Anthony Sanford, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Billy Taylor, Austin Tudeme, David Walters. (West, Joshua)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: This matter remains STAYED pending the next scheduled status update or the filing of the parties' settlement agreement, which they anticipate before the next reporting deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 7/22/2019. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
July 19, 2019 Filing 64 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Motion to Continue #62 is GRANTED. The matter remains stayed pending the parties next scheduled status update. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/19/19. (dt)
June 17, 2019 Filing 62 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua) Modified on 6/19/2019 (dt).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER: This matter remains stayed pending the parties' next status update. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/21/2019. (jw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 60 STATUS REPORT by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: The stay of this matter previously issued to facilitate its resolution remains in place pending the next status update of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/24/2019. (jw)
April 18, 2019 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement and Request to Hold Deadlines in Abeyance by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: In this status report, the parties notify the Court that they have settled this action and ask the Court to extend its stay of the litigation while they explore the possibility of consolidating multiple related actions that have also been resolved. The motion is GRANTED. This action remains STAYED pending further order of the Court. The parties shall file a joint status report every 30 days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/19/2019. (jw)
March 14, 2019 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement and Request to Hold Deadlines in Abeyance by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #54 Joint Motion to Stay Litigation to Permit the Parties to Participate in Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/30/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
November 30, 2018 Filing 54 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation to Permit the Parties to Participate in Mediation by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Eli J. Richardson for all further proceedings. District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/22/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 19, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Supplemental Authority in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Marshall v. Express Courier Order Granting Motion to Dismiss)(Butcher, Andrew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Supplemental Authority Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bascomb v. Express Courier International, Inc. Order)(Butcher, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: A telephonic case management conference is set for December 5, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 10/9/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(jw)
October 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Telephone Case Management Conference held on 10/9/2018. (tm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. of Supplemental Authority Supporting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Butcher, Andrew)
July 31, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order, Allen v. Express Courier Int'l., Inc., No. 3:18-cv-28-MOC-DSC (W.D. N.C. July 25, 2018), ECF No. 25)(West, Joshua)
June 20, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim --SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY-- (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Op. and Order, Arroyo v. Express Courier Intl., Inc., No. 4:18-cv-10 (S.D. Tex. June 18, 2018), ECF No. 24)(West, Joshua)
June 18, 2018 Filing 46 DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. re #36 Response in Opposition to Motion re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Express Courier International, Inc., EMP LSO Holding Corporation. (mg)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: Motion #43 GRANTED for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/18/2018. (mg)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A826 before District Judge William L. Campbell Jr. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/4/2019; Exhibit List due by 11/4/2019; and Witness List due by 11/4/2019. The cost of summoning the jury may be assessed against the parties if a settlement is reached after the Thursday immediately preceding trial. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 6/13/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
June 5, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim)(Hinds, Rebecca)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2018; Discovery due by 5/31/2019; and Dispositive Motions due by 7/1/2019. A subsequent case management conference shall be held telephonically on October 9, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. to address: status of discovery (including any known or anticipated discovery issues or disputes); prospect for settlement (including propriety of ADR); and, any other appropriate matters. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 6/5/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) Modified text on 6/5/2018 (mg).
June 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/5/2018. (tm)
June 1, 2018 Filing 41 STIPULATION Regarding Electronic Discovery by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
June 1, 2018 Filing 40 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Joint and Agreed) filed by All Plaintiffs. (West, Joshua)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to appear in person at the Initial Case Management Conference and for Lead Counsel to appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/31/2018. (mg)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Charles Andrewscavage to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/30/2018. (mg)
May 30, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to Appear In Person at Initial Case Management Conference and for Lead Counsel to Appear by Telephone by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Hinds, Rebecca)
May 29, 2018 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Leave for Attorney Joshua West to Appear by Telephone at Initial Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/23/2018. (mg)
May 21, 2018 Filing 34 RECEIPT #34675050436 in the amount of $75.00 posted by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. re #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mg)
May 21, 2018 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Leave to for Attorney Joshua West to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Scheduling Conference by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (West, Joshua)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: On May 15, 2018, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss. (Doc. No. #27 .) Pursuant to Local Rule 7.01(b), any response is to be filed within 14 days after service of the motion. No reply shall be filed without leave of Court. Any filings made related to the motion to dismiss, including motions for extensions of time or to exceed page limits, shall be decided by Judge Campbell unless referred to the undersigned magistrate judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 5/18/2018. (mg)
May 16, 2018 NY State Bar status verified as active for Charles Andrewscavage. (mg)
May 16, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Charles Andrewscavage: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall pay a fee of $100.00 (LR 83.01(d)). PHV due by 6/6/2018. (mg) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (mg).
May 15, 2018 Filing 31 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #28 Brief (non-appeal). (Quillen, Emily)
May 15, 2018 Filing 30 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Express Courier International, Inc.. (Quillen, Emily)
May 15, 2018 Filing 29 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation. (Quillen, Emily)
May 15, 2018 Filing 28 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Motion to Dismiss filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Quillen, Emily) Modified text on 5/16/2018 (mg).
May 15, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. (Quillen, Emily)
May 15, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for attorney(s) Charles Andrewscavage to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee not paid-due within 21 days) by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Hinds, Rebecca)
April 20, 2018 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by Alexander Smith, Derrick Schofield, George Dillard, III, Steve Butzer, Tyrone Scott, Michael Rearden, Curtis Overbay, Charles Russell, Kelsey Robinson, Larry DeWeese, Seneca Otey, Vivian Briggs, Bud Barnett, Rena Jeffries, Willie Fasolo, Oscar Love, Tammy Coleman, Stephen Brodien, Roy Walton, Carlis Taylor, Roy Robinson, Kim Smith, John Walker, Michael Morrison, Ambrose Jones, Kalifa Jaiteh, Burl Ferguson, David Crain, Marius Easley, Cal Colbenson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Valerica Gafencu, Gary Bell, Andrew Anderson, Amy Whitworth, Cheryl McNeal, Rodney Thomas, Brian Coleman, Todd Matthews, Derek Everett, Timothy Russell, Liliana Nikolic, Martin Brychta, Jennifer Beard, Joyce Puff, Johnathan Gooden, Harold Hamstra, Iris Lucas, Dirk McVicker, William Royals, Friday Ulumenfo, Jeffrey Grey, Jason Higgins, John Eldridge, Brenda Askew, Rosheka Douglas, Darrell Carpenter, Anthony Sanford, Nikia F. Payne, Daniel Thomas, John Newman, Meredith Coomer, Melissa Caldwell, Steve Petty, Thomas Morgan, Tim Knight, Sean Burns, Leslie McNish, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Kristopher Ferguson, Joan Dowell, Kaiser Powell, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Joe Augusta, Jr., Sharika Ostine, Pamela Dulin, Kawana Patterson, Anna Sutter, Abel Massey, Michael Nicoletti, Corry Knowles, Glenda Dotson, Bonnie Puff, James Butler, Robinson Mwangi, Bobby Goforth, Jim A. DuCharme, Shelbi Bond, Doyle McGlamery, Turpin Smith, Jerry Horowitz, J.D. Dohnal, Roger Stephens, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Robert Vogt, Ashley Morgan, Dana Swailes, Marcus Carlisle, Myron Davis, Darrell Putnam, Claude Poore, Jr., Sirlina Barnes, Gary Shields, Tonya Ricketts, Julie Ewell, Michael Taylor, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, Linda McConnell, Mary Bogan, Allen Wafer, Thomas M. Hermes, Tameka Patton, Michael Bennett, Ronnie Ross, Mitch Bingham, Joshua Matt Daniels, Flora Gonzalez, Michael L. Adkison, Sheri Bell, Mary Banks, Shameka Brown, Margaret Telford, Ahmed Alani, Margaret Italia, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Watkins, Jeremy Davidson, Steven Cook, James Gallahan, George Lee, III, Lester L. Steinback, Henry Miller, Austin Tudeme, Leanne Brown, Antony Mitchell, Joseph Crisco, Steven Teston, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Tim Coradini, III, Debra Hale, Jamille Watts, Paul Stewart, Homer Crawford, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Thomas Hubbard, Cynthia Walker, Brian Pirtle, Richard Harris, Jason Mercado, David Mallery, Brian D. Cole, Mary Wilson, Khorri Slaughter, Micquan Ferguson, Brian Traughber, Jeremy N. Cox, Penny Rearden, Raymond Clay, Richard Williams, Shelby Capelli, Kelly Vaughn, Jose Dominguez, Billy Taylor, Maggie L. Dean, William Dulin, Viva Hoover, Benneth Wilson, Sabrina Benton, Eddie Collins, Vicki Stafford, William Billups, William Smith, Tauris L. Yates, Tony Finch, Paul Dodson, Michael Blassingame, Mario Jackson, Charlotte Ball, Erica McWilliams, Patrick K. Johnson, Judy Rogers, Ivy Flowers, Clarence Williams, Norman Morgan, Tiffany Smith, Lakeshea Moss, Paige Acklin, Donald Hash, Larry Sullivan, Larry Perkins, Brian Drake, Crystal Sanderson, Steve Barnett, Jimmy White, William McElroy, John Eric Cheney, Jason Calvin, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Brenda Brown, Richard Simmons, III, DeShun Flowers, Frederick Holliday, Wyndel Walker, Gary Frye, Jose Martinez, Dean Ennis, Terrance Boyd, Jamie Holloman, Quania Johnson, Elmo Kieloch, Carl Martin, Cheryl Drake, Javonna Webb, Michael McDonald, Sr., April Martinez, Jerry Harper, Jr., Mohsen Ramsis, Ronald Holt, Corik Anderson, Michael J. Lewis, Amber Cowsert, James Johnson, Carey Mitchell, Diane Towns, Takeshia Clark, Steve Acuff, David Shinn, Charles Blevins, Jennifer Gaudet, Ronnie Holden, Glen Crawford, Khalid AlSaadun, Tracy Bond, Ann Williams, David Walters, Don Starks, David Rathbone, Willie Reynolds, Danny Muse, Gerald Mann, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Jerry Wilson.(Nelson, Jesse)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The motion #17 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the Second Amended Complaint by April 25, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/18/2018. (mg) Modified text on 4/19/2018 (mg).
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Emily A. Quillen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/18/2018. (mg)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Adam C. Smedstad to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/18/2018. (mg)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Andrew J. Butcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 4/18/2018. (mg)
April 17, 2018 IN State Bar status verified as active for Andrew J. Butcher; TX State Bar status verified as active for Emily A. Quillen; and IL State Bar status verified as active for Adam C. Smedstad (mg) Modified text on 4/18/2018 (mg).
April 17, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney(s) Adam C. Smedstad to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2654188) by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing for Adam C. Smedstad)(Butcher, Andrew)
April 17, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney(s) Emily A. Quillen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2653952) by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Quillen, Emily)
April 16, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for attorney(s) Andrew J. Butcher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2652939) by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Butcher, Andrew)
April 11, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 Amended Complaint, by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (Nelson, Jesse)
March 19, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexander Smith, Derrick Schofield, George Dillard, III, Steve Butzer, Tyrone Scott, Michael Rearden, Curtis Overbay, Charles Russell, Kelsey Robinson, Larry DeWeese, Seneca Otey, Vivian Briggs, Bud Barnett, Rena Jeffries, Willie Fasolo, Oscar Love, Tammy Coleman, Stephen Brodien, Roy Walton, Carlis Taylor, Roy Robinson, Kim Smith, John Walker, Michael Morrison, Ambrose Jones, Kalifa Jaiteh, Burl Ferguson, David Crain, Marius Easley, Cal Colbenson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Valerica Gafencu, Gary Bell, Andrew Anderson, Amy Whitworth, Cheryl McNeal, Rodney Thomas, Brian Coleman, Todd Matthews, Derek Everett, Timothy Russell, Liliana Nikolic, Martin Brychta, Jennifer Beard, Joyce Puff, Johnathan Gooden, Harold Hamstra, Iris Lucas, Dirk McVicker, William Royals, Friday Ulumenfo, Jeffrey Grey, Jason Higgins, John Eldridge, Brenda Askew, Rosheka Douglas, Darrell Carpenter, Anthony Sanford, Nikia F. Payne, Daniel Thomas, John Newman, Meredith Coomer, Melissa Caldwell, Steve Petty, Thomas Morgan, Tim Knight, Sean Burns, Leslie McNish, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Kristopher Ferguson, Joan Dowell, Kaiser Powell, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Joe Augusta, Jr., Sharika Ostine, Pamela Dulin, Kawana Patterson, Anna Sutter, Abel Massey, Michael Nicoletti, Corry Knowles, Glenda Dotson, Bonnie Puff, James Butler, Robinson Mwangi, Bobby Goforth, Jim A. DuCharme, Shelbi Bond, Doyle McGlamery, Turpin Smith, Jerry Horowitz, J.D. Dohnal, Roger Stephens, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Robert Vogt, Ashley Morgan, Dana Swailes, Marcus Carlisle, Myron Davis, Darrell Putnam, Claude Poore, Jr., Sirlina Barnes, Gary Shields, Tonya Ricketts, Julie Ewell, Michael Taylor, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, Linda McConnell, Mary Bogan, Allen Wafer, Thomas M. Hermes, Tameka Patton, Michael Bennett, Ronnie Ross, Mitch Bingham, Joshua Matt Daniels, Flora Gonzalez, Michael L. Adkison, Sheri Bell, Mary Banks, Shameka Brown, Margaret Telford, Ahmed Alani, Margaret Italia, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Watkins, Jeremy Davidson, Steven Cook, James Gallahan, George Lee, III, Lester L. Steinback, Henry Miller, Austin Tudeme, Leanne Brown, Antony Mitchell, Joseph Crisco, Steven Teston, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Tim Coradini, III, Debra Hale, Jamille Watts, Paul Stewart, Homer Crawford, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Thomas Hubbard, Cynthia Walker, Brian Pirtle, Richard Harris, Jason Mercado, David Mallery, Brian D. Cole, Mary Wilson, Khorri Slaughter, Micquan Ferguson, Brian Traughber, Jeremy N. Cox, Penny Rearden, Raymond Clay, Richard Williams, Shelby Capelli, Kelly Vaughn, Jose Dominguez, Billy Taylor, Maggie L. Dean, William Dulin, Viva Hoover, Benneth Wilson, Sabrina Benton, Eddie Collins, Vicki Stafford, William Billups, William Smith, Tauris L. Yates, Tony Finch, Paul Dodson, Michael Blassingame, Mario Jackson, Charlotte Ball, Erica McWilliams, Patrick K. Johnson, Judy Rogers, Ivy Flowers, Clarence Williams, Norman Morgan, Tiffany Smith, Lakeshea Moss, Paige Acklin, Donald Hash, Larry Sullivan, Larry Perkins, Brian Drake, Crystal Sanderson, Steve Barnett, Jimmy White, William McElroy, John Eric Cheney, Jason Calvin, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Brenda Brown, Richard Simmons, III, DeShun Flowers, Frederick Holliday, Wyndel Walker, Gary Frye, Jose Martinez, Dean Ennis, Terrance Boyd, Jamie Holloman, Quania Johnson, Elmo Kieloch, Carl Martin, Cheryl Drake, Javonna Webb, Michael McDonald, Sr., April Martinez, Jerry Harper, Jr., Mohsen Ramsis, Ronald Holt, Corik Anderson, Michael J. Lewis, Amber Cowsert, James Johnson, Carey Mitchell, Diane Towns, Takeshia Clark, Steve Acuff, David Shinn, Charles Blevins, Jennifer Gaudet, Ronnie Holden, Glen Crawford, Khalid AlSaadun, Tracy Bond, Ann Williams, David Walters, Don Starks, David Rathbone, Willie Reynolds, Danny Muse, Gerald Mann, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Jerry Wilson. EMP LSO Holding Corporation waiver sent on 3/16/2018. (Nelson, Jesse)
March 19, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alexander Smith, Derrick Schofield, George Dillard, III, Steve Butzer, Tyrone Scott, Michael Rearden, Curtis Overbay, Charles Russell, Kelsey Robinson, Larry DeWeese, Seneca Otey, Vivian Briggs, Bud Barnett, Rena Jeffries, Willie Fasolo, Oscar Love, Tammy Coleman, Stephen Brodien, Roy Walton, Carlis Taylor, Roy Robinson, Kim Smith, John Walker, Michael Morrison, Ambrose Jones, Kalifa Jaiteh, Burl Ferguson, David Crain, Marius Easley, Cal Colbenson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Valerica Gafencu, Gary Bell, Andrew Anderson, Amy Whitworth, Cheryl McNeal, Rodney Thomas, Brian Coleman, Todd Matthews, Derek Everett, Timothy Russell, Liliana Nikolic, Martin Brychta, Jennifer Beard, Joyce Puff, Johnathan Gooden, Harold Hamstra, Iris Lucas, Dirk McVicker, William Royals, Friday Ulumenfo, Jeffrey Grey, Jason Higgins, John Eldridge, Brenda Askew, Rosheka Douglas, Darrell Carpenter, Anthony Sanford, Nikia F. Payne, Daniel Thomas, John Newman, Meredith Coomer, Melissa Caldwell, Steve Petty, Thomas Morgan, Tim Knight, Sean Burns, Leslie McNish, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Kristopher Ferguson, Joan Dowell, Kaiser Powell, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Joe Augusta, Jr., Sharika Ostine, Pamela Dulin, Kawana Patterson, Anna Sutter, Abel Massey, Michael Nicoletti, Corry Knowles, Glenda Dotson, Bonnie Puff, James Butler, Robinson Mwangi, Bobby Goforth, Jim A. DuCharme, Shelbi Bond, Doyle McGlamery, Turpin Smith, Jerry Horowitz, J.D. Dohnal, Roger Stephens, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Robert Vogt, Ashley Morgan, Dana Swailes, Marcus Carlisle, Myron Davis, Darrell Putnam, Claude Poore, Jr., Sirlina Barnes, Gary Shields, Tonya Ricketts, Julie Ewell, Michael Taylor, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, Linda McConnell, Mary Bogan, Allen Wafer, Thomas M. Hermes, Tameka Patton, Michael Bennett, Ronnie Ross, Mitch Bingham, Joshua Matt Daniels, Flora Gonzalez, Michael L. Adkison, Sheri Bell, Mary Banks, Shameka Brown, Margaret Telford, Ahmed Alani, Margaret Italia, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Watkins, Jeremy Davidson, Steven Cook, James Gallahan, George Lee, III, Lester L. Steinback, Henry Miller, Austin Tudeme, Leanne Brown, Antony Mitchell, Joseph Crisco, Steven Teston, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Tim Coradini, III, Debra Hale, Jamille Watts, Paul Stewart, Homer Crawford, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Thomas Hubbard, Cynthia Walker, Brian Pirtle, Richard Harris, Jason Mercado, David Mallery, Brian D. Cole, Mary Wilson, Khorri Slaughter, Micquan Ferguson, Brian Traughber, Jeremy N. Cox, Penny Rearden, Raymond Clay, Richard Williams, Shelby Capelli, Kelly Vaughn, Jose Dominguez, Billy Taylor, Maggie L. Dean, William Dulin, Viva Hoover, Benneth Wilson, Sabrina Benton, Eddie Collins, Vicki Stafford, William Billups, William Smith, Tauris L. Yates, Tony Finch, Paul Dodson, Michael Blassingame, Mario Jackson, Charlotte Ball, Erica McWilliams, Patrick K. Johnson, Judy Rogers, Ivy Flowers, Clarence Williams, Norman Morgan, Tiffany Smith, Lakeshea Moss, Paige Acklin, Donald Hash, Larry Sullivan, Larry Perkins, Brian Drake, Crystal Sanderson, Steve Barnett, Jimmy White, William McElroy, John Eric Cheney, Jason Calvin, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Brenda Brown, Richard Simmons, III, DeShun Flowers, Frederick Holliday, Wyndel Walker, Gary Frye, Jose Martinez, Dean Ennis, Terrance Boyd, Jamie Holloman, Quania Johnson, Elmo Kieloch, Carl Martin, Cheryl Drake, Javonna Webb, Michael McDonald, Sr., April Martinez, Jerry Harper, Jr., Mohsen Ramsis, Ronald Holt, Corik Anderson, Michael J. Lewis, Amber Cowsert, James Johnson, Carey Mitchell, Diane Towns, Takeshia Clark, Steve Acuff, David Shinn, Charles Blevins, Jennifer Gaudet, Ronnie Holden, Glen Crawford, Khalid AlSaadun, Tracy Bond, Ann Williams, David Walters, Don Starks, David Rathbone, Willie Reynolds, Danny Muse, Gerald Mann, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Jerry Wilson. Express Courier International, Inc. waiver sent on 3/16/2018. (Nelson, Jesse)
March 6, 2018 Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference is reset for 6/5/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (mg)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Upon the Joint Motion of the parties, and for good cause shown, this Court hereby finds that the Initial Case Management Conference currently set for March 12, 2018, shall be rescheduled to June 5, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 3/6/2018. (mg)
March 6, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Hinds, Rebecca)
March 1, 2018 AR State Bar status verified as active for Joshua Lee West. (mg)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Joshua Lee West to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 2/28/2018. (mg)
February 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney(s) Joshua Lee West to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2620094) by Paige Acklin, Steve Acuff, Michael L. Adkison, Khalid AlSaadun, Ahmed Alani, Andrew Anderson, Corik Anderson, Brenda Askew, Joe Augusta, Jr., Charlotte Ball, Mary Banks, Sirlina Barnes, Bud Barnett, Steve Barnett, Jennifer Beard, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Sheri Bell, Michael Bennett, Sabrina Benton, William Billups, Mitch Bingham, Michael Blassingame, Charles Blevins, Mary Bogan, Shelbi Bond, Tracy Bond, Terrance Boyd, Vivian Briggs, Stephen Brodien, Brenda Brown, Leanne Brown, Shameka Brown, Martin Brychta, Sean Burns, James Butler, Steve Butzer, Melissa Caldwell, Jason Calvin, Shelby Capelli, Marcus Carlisle, Darrell Carpenter, John Eric Cheney, Takeshia Clark, Raymond Clay, Cal Colbenson, Brian D. Cole, Brian Coleman, Tammy Coleman, Eddie Collins, Steven Cook, Meredith Coomer, Tim Coradini, III, Amber Cowsert, Jeremy N. Cox, David Crain, Glen Crawford, Homer Crawford, Joseph Crisco, Joshua Matt Daniels, Jeremy Davidson, Myron Davis, Larry DeWeese, Maggie L. Dean, George Dillard, III, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Paul Dodson, J.D. Dohnal, Jose Dominguez, Glenda Dotson, Rosheka Douglas, Joan Dowell, Brian Drake, Cheryl Drake, Jim A. DuCharme, Pamela Dulin, William Dulin, Marius Easley, John Eldridge, Dean Ennis, Derek Everett, Julie Ewell, Willie Fasolo, Burl Ferguson, Kristopher Ferguson, Micquan Ferguson, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Tony Finch, DeShun Flowers, Ivy Flowers, Jeraldine Franklin, Gary Frye, Valerica Gafencu, James Gallahan, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Jennifer Gaudet, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Bobby Goforth, Caroline Golamnobee, Flora Gonzalez, Johnathan Gooden, Jeffrey Grey, Debra Hale, Harold Hamstra, Jerry Harper, Jr., Richard Harris, Donald Hash, Thomas M. Hermes, Jason Higgins, Ronnie Holden, Frederick Holliday, Jamie Holloman, Ronald Holt, Viva Hoover, Jerry Horowitz, Thomas Hubbard, Margaret Italia, Mario Jackson, Kalifa Jaiteh, Rena Jeffries, James Johnson, Patrick K. Johnson, Quania Johnson, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Ambrose Jones, Elmo Kieloch, Tim Knight, Corry Knowles, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, George Lee, III, Michael J. Lewis, Oscar Love, Iris Lucas, David Mallery, Gerald Mann, Carl Martin, April Martinez, Jose Martinez, Abel Massey, Todd Matthews, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Linda McConnell, Michael McDonald, Sr., William McElroy, Doyle McGlamery, Cheryl McNeal, Leslie McNish, Dirk McVicker, Erica McWilliams, Jason Mercado, Henry Miller, Antony Mitchell, Carey Mitchell, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Ashley Morgan, Norman Morgan, Thomas Morgan, Michael Morrison, Lakeshea Moss, Danny Muse, Robinson Mwangi, John Newman, Michael Nicoletti, Liliana Nikolic, Sharika Ostine, Seneca Otey, Curtis Overbay, Kawana Patterson, Tameka Patton, Nikia F. Payne, Larry Perkins, Steve Petty, Brian Pirtle, Claude Poore, Jr., Kaiser Powell, Bonnie Puff, Joyce Puff, Darrell Putnam, Mohsen Ramsis, David Rathbone, Michael Rearden, Penny Rearden, Willie Reynolds, Tonya Ricketts, Kelsey Robinson, Roy Robinson, Judy Rogers, Ronnie Ross, William Royals, Charles Russell, Timothy Russell, Crystal Sanderson, Anthony Sanford, Derrick Schofield, Tyrone Scott, Gary Shields, David Shinn, Richard Simmons, III, Khorri Slaughter, Alexander Smith, Kim Smith, Tiffany Smith, Turpin Smith, William Smith, Vicki Stafford, Don Starks, Lester L. Steinback, Roger Stephens, Paul Stewart, Larry Sullivan, Anna Sutter, Dana Swailes, Billy Taylor, Carlis Taylor, Michael Taylor, Margaret Telford, Steven Teston, Daniel Thomas, Rodney Thomas, Diane Towns, Brian Traughber, Austin Tudeme, Friday Ulumenfo, Kelly Vaughn, Robert Vogt, Allen Wafer, Cynthia Walker, John Walker, Wyndel Walker, David Walters, Roy Walton, Tammy Watkins, Jamille Watts, Javonna Webb, Jimmy White, Amy Whitworth, Ann Williams, Clarence Williams, Richard Williams, Benneth Wilson, Jerry Wilson, Mary Wilson, Tauris L. Yates. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Nelson, Jesse)
February 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 776 before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. Counsel shall submit a proposed initial case management order three (3) business days prior to the conference. (mg)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 2/20/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)
February 20, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Lee L. Piovarcy, and Rebecca Keaton Hinds. (mg)
February 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Keaton Hinds on behalf of EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. (Hinds, Rebecca)
February 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee L. Piovarcy on behalf of EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. (Piovarcy, Lee)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 138, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. for all purposes. It is further ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled before Judge Trauger on March 5, 2018 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/25/2018. (mg)
January 12, 2018 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against Express Courier International, Inc., and EMP LSO Holding Corporation, filed by Alexander Smith, Derrick Schofield, George Dillard, III, Steve Butzer, Tyrone Scott, Michael Rearden, Curtis Overbay, Charles Russell, Kelsey Robinson, Larry DeWeese, Seneca Otey, Vivian Briggs, Bud Barnett, Rena Jeffries, Willie Fasolo, Oscar Love, Tammy Coleman, Stephen Brodien, Roy Walton, Carlis Taylor, Roy Robinson, Kim Smith, John Walker, Michael Morrison, Ambrose Jones, Kalifa Jaiteh, Burl Ferguson, David Crain, Marius Easley, Cal Colbenson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Andrew Anderson, Amy Whitworth, Cheryl McNeal, Rodney Thomas, Brian Coleman, Todd Matthews, Derek Everett, Timothy Russell, Liliana Nikolic, Martin Brychta, Jennifer Beard, Joyce Puff, Johnathan Gooden, Harold Hamstra, Iris Lucas, Dirk McVicker, William Royals, Friday Ulumenfo, Jeffrey Grey, Jason Higgins, John Eldridge, Brenda Askew, Rosheka Douglas, Darrell Carpenter, Anthony Sanford, Nikia F. Payne, Daniel Thomas, John Newman, Meredith Coomer, Melissa Caldwell, Steve Petty, Thomas Morgan, Tim Knight, Sean Burns, Leslie McNish, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Kristopher Ferguson, Joan Dowell, Kaiser Powell, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Joe Augusta, Jr., Sharika Ostine, Pamela Dulin, Kawana Patterson, Anna Sutter, Abel Massey, Michael Nicoletti, Corry Knowles, Glenda Dotson, Bonnie Puff, James Butler, Robinson Mwangi, Bobby Goforth, Jim A. DuCharme, Shelbi Bond, Doyle McGlamery, Turpin Smith, Jerry Horowitz, J.D. Dohnal, Roger Stephens, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Robert Vogt, Ashley Morgan, Dana Swailes, Marcus Carlisle, Myron Davis, Darrell Putnam, Claude Poore, Jr., Sirlina Barnes, Gary Shields, Tonya Ricketts, Julie Ewell, Michael Taylor, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, Linda McConnell, Mary Bogan, Allen Wafer, Thomas M. Hermes, Tameka Patton, Michael Bennett, Ronnie Ross, Mitch Bingham, Joshua Matt Daniels, Flora Gonzalez, Michael L. Adkison, Sheri Bell, Mary Banks, Shameka Brown, Margaret Telford, Ahmed Alani, Margaret Italia, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Watkins, Jeremy Davidson, Steven Cook, James Gallahan, George Lee, III, Lester L. Steinback, Henry Miller, Austin Tudeme, Leanne Brown, Antony Mitchell, Joseph Crisco, Steven Teston, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Tim Coradini, III, Debra Hale, Jamille Watts, Paul Stewart, Homer Crawford, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Thomas Hubbard, Cynthia Walker, Brian Pirtle, Richard Harris, Jason Mercado, David Mallery, Brian D. Cole, Mary Wilson, Khorri Slaughter, Micquan Ferguson, Brian Traughber, Jeremy N. Cox, Penny Rearden, Raymond Clay, Richard Williams, Shelby Capelli, Kelly Vaughn, Jose Dominguez, Billy Taylor, Maggie L. Dean, William Dulin, Viva Hoover, Benneth Wilson, Sabrina Benton, Eddie Collins, Vicki Stafford, William Billups, William Smith, Tauris L. Yates, Tony Finch, Michael Blassingame, Mario Jackson, Charlotte Ball, Erica McWilliams, Patrick K. Johnson, Judy Rogers, Clarence Williams, Norman Morgan, Tiffany Smith, Lakeshea Moss, Paige Acklin, Larry Sullivan, Larry Perkins, Brian Drake, Crystal Sanderson, Steve Barnett, Jimmy White, William McElroy, John Eric Cheney, Jason Calvin, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Brenda Brown, Richard Simmons, III, Frederick Holliday, Wyndel Walker, Gary Frye, Jose Martinez, Dean Ennis, Terrance Boyd, Jamie Holloman, Quania Johnson, Elmo Kieloch, Carl Martin, Cheryl Drake, Javonna Webb, Michael McDonald, Sr., April Martinez, Jerry Harper, Jr., Mohsen Ramsis, Ronald Holt, Corik Anderson, Amber Cowsert, James Johnson, Michael J. Lewis, Carey Mitchell, Diane Towns, Takeshia Clark, Steve Acuff, David Shinn, Jennifer Gaudet, Ronnie Holden, Glen Crawford, Khalid AlSaadun, Tracy Bond, Ann Williams, David Walters, Don Starks, David Rathbone, Willie Reynolds, Danny Muse, Gerald Mann, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Jerry Wilson.(Nelson, Jesse) Modified text on 1/17/2018 (mg).
January 10, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Jesse D. Nelson. (mg)
January 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 3:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg)
January 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
January 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
January 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc. (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2587370), filed by Alexander Smith, Derrick Schofield, George Dillard, III, Steve Butzer, Tyrone Scott, Michael Rearden, Curtis Overbay, Charles Russell, Kelsey Robinson, Larry DeWeese, Seneca Otey, Vivian Briggs, Bud Barnett, Rena Jeffries, Willie Fasolo, Oscar Love, Tammy Coleman, Stephen Brodien, Roy Walton, Carlis Taylor, Roy Robinson, Kim Smith, John Walker, Michael Morrison, Ambrose Jones, Kalifa Jaiteh, Burl Ferguson, David Crain, Marius Easley, Cal Colbenson, Jeraldine Franklin, Tina Beard, Gary Bell, Andrew Anderson, Amy Whitworth, Cheryl McNeal, Rodney Thomas, Brian Coleman, Todd Matthews, Derek Everett, Timothy Russell, Liliana Nikolic, Martin Brychta, Jennifer Beard, Joyce Puff, Johnathan Gooden, Harold Hamstra, Iris Lucas, Dirk McVicker, William Royals, Friday Ulumenfo, Jeffrey Grey, Jason Higgins, John Eldridge, Brenda Askew, Rosheka Douglas, Darrell Carpenter, Anthony Sanford, Nikia F. Payne, Daniel Thomas, John Newman, Meredith Coomer, Melissa Caldwell, Steve Petty, Thomas Morgan, Tim Knight, Sean Burns, Leslie McNish, Ingrid Johnson-Griffin, Kristopher Ferguson, Joan Dowell, Kaiser Powell, Dieufrant Dodorlye, Joe Augusta, Jr., Sharika Ostine, Pamela Dulin, Kawana Patterson, Anna Sutter, Abel Massey, Michael Nicoletti, Corry Knowles, Glenda Dotson, Bonnie Puff, James Butler, Robinson Mwangi, Bobby Goforth, Jim A. DuCharme, Shelbi Bond, Doyle McGlamery, Turpin Smith, Jerry Horowitz, J.D. Dohnal, Roger Stephens, Andrew Gardner, Jr., Robert Vogt, Ashley Morgan, Dana Swailes, Marcus Carlisle, Myron Davis, Darrell Putnam, Claude Poore, Jr., Sirlina Barnes, Gary Shields, Tonya Ricketts, Julie Ewell, Michael Taylor, Ruby Lane, Maurice Laster, Linda McConnell, Mary Bogan, Allen Wafer, Thomas M. Hermes, Tameka Patton, Michael Bennett, Ronnie Ross, Mitch Bingham, Joshua Matt Daniels, Flora Gonzalez, Michael L. Adkison, Sheri Bell, Mary Banks, Shameka Brown, Margaret Telford, Ahmed Alani, Margaret Italia, Caroline Golamnobee, Tammy Watkins, Jeremy Davidson, Steven Cook, James Gallahan, George Lee, III, Lester L. Steinback, Henry Miller, Austin Tudeme, Leanne Brown, Antony Mitchell, Joseph Crisco, Steven Teston, Thaddeus McClinton, Sr., Tim Coradini, III, Debra Hale, Jamille Watts, Paul Stewart, Homer Crawford, Jerry Gilbert, Jr., Thomas Hubbard, Cynthia Walker, Brian Pirtle, Richard Harris, Jason Mercado, David Mallery, Brian D. Cole, Mary Wilson, Khorri Slaughter, Micquan Ferguson, Brian Traughber, Jeremy N. Cox, Penny Rearden, Raymond Clay, Richard Williams, Shelby Capelli, Kelly Vaughn, Jose Dominguez, Billy Taylor, Maggie L. Dean, William Dulin, Viva Hoover, Benneth Wilson, Sabrina Benton, Eddie Collins, Vicki Stafford, William Billups, William Smith, Tauris L. Yates, Tony Finch, Michael Blassingame, Mario Jackson, Charlotte Ball, Erica McWilliams, Patrick K. Johnson, Judy Rogers, Clarence Williams, Norman Morgan, Tiffany Smith, Lakeshea Moss, Paige Acklin, Larry Sullivan, Larry Perkins, Brian Drake, Crystal Sanderson, Steve Barnett, Jimmy White, William McElroy, John Eric Cheney, Jason Calvin, Kevin Montgomery, French Moore, Brenda Brown, Richard Simmons, III, Frederick Holliday, Wyndel Walker, Gary Frye, Jose Martinez, Dean Ennis, Terrance Boyd, Jamie Holloman, Quania Johnson, Elmo Kieloch, Carl Martin, Cheryl Drake, Javonna Webb, Michael McDonald, Sr., April Martinez, Jerry Harper, Jr., Mohsen Ramsis, Ronald Holt, Corik Anderson, Amber Cowsert, James Johnson, Michael J. Lewis, Carey Mitchell, Diane Towns, Takeshia Clark, Steve Acuff, David Shinn, Jennifer Gaudet, Ronnie Holden, Glen Crawford, Khalid AlSaadun, Tracy Bond, Ann Williams, David Walters, Don Starks, David Rathbone, Willie Reynolds, Danny Muse, Gerald Mann, Raimundo Ferrer, Drana R. Fields, Jerry Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons - Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail.)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acklin et al v. Express Courier International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Vogt
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Jackson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Wilson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Williams
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dulin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Banks
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antony Mitchell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Schofield
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Nikolic
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benneth Wilson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Brown
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Cheney
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shameka Brown
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Holliday
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Acklin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Barnett
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Cowsert
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Horowitz
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homer Crawford
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ross
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eldridge
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Brodien
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bogan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivy Flowers
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Holloman
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sirlina Barnes
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Dillard, III
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerica Gafencu
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mallery
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Teston
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalifa Jaiteh
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Mercado
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Tudeme
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee, III
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica McWilliams
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlis Taylor
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.D. Dohnal
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Holt
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Coleman
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kawana Patterson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Shinn
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Williams
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie L. Dean
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Russell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corry Knowles
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friday Ulumenfo
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Rearden
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamille Watts
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Bell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Walton
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tauris L. Yates
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Lewis
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Johnson-Griffin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rearden
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Taylor
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Ewell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: French Moore
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Brown
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Laster
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Ennis
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McDonald, Sr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosheka Douglas
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Davis
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Smith
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Carpenter
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Butler
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Taylor
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Petty
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Stephens
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid AlSaadun
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Royals
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Puff
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Sullivan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iris Lucas
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Crawford
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bennett
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hash
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk McVicker
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Calvin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Love
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Traughber
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Mwangi
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl McNeal
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Stewart
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Jeffries
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dieufrant Dodorlye
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Askew
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Caldwell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pirtle
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelbi Bond
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Ball
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Carlisle
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Putnam
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Watkins
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Puff
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca Otey
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Walker
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie McNish
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Fasolo
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Butzer
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Perkins
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Gooden
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Newman
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Reynolds
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Boyd
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Towns
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Montgomery
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmo Kieloch
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turpin Smith
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Holden
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morrison
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nicoletti
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Robinson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed Alani
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Smith
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Harper, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Simmons, III
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Sanderson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Shields
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Robinson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal Colbenson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester L. Steinback
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick K. Johnson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeraldine Franklin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Beard
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Miller
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Augusta, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marius Easley
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Hermes
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javonna Webb
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Walker
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Drake
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gilbert, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Anderson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Lane
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Stafford
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Capelli
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gallahan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshea Moss
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Goforth
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Knight
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Telford
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Clay
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Rogers
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Collins
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abel Massey
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Matthews
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Gonzalez
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Martinez
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Blevins
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Italia
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Martinez
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy White
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Martin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikia F. Payne
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Overbay
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Coomer
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Bingham
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeShun Flowers
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Grey
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Finch
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Thomas
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Crain
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Thomas
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khorri Slaughter
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viva Hoover
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McElroy
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Sutter
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Billups
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tameka Patton
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy N. Cox
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Frye
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Smith
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Brychta
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dulin
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Gaudet
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hale
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Dominguez
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Swailes
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry DeWeese
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyndel Walker
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus McClinton, Sr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim A. DuCharme
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wilson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Morgan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Crisco
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micquan Ferguson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morgan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Poore, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Everett
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Benton
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaiser Powell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Harris
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Barnett
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Golamnobee
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Coleman
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raimundo Ferrer
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ambrose Jones
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Briggs
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hubbard
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cook
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Walters
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. James Johnson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Whitworth
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Starks
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Adkison
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sanford
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Bond
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carey Mitchell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rathbone
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohsen Ramsis
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quania Johnson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Burns
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gardner, Jr.
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Scott
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Dodson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doyle McGlamery
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda McConnell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dowell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Davidson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Muse
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Morgan
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian D. Cole
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Russell
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Mann
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Matt Daniels
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Dotson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Vaughn
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blassingame
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corik Anderson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Drake
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharika Ostine
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Ferguson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Wafer
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Ricketts
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Acuff
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Higgins
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drana R. Fields
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl Ferguson
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Beard
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Williams
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takeshia Clark
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Coradini, III
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hamstra
Represented By: Jesse D. Nelson
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP LSO Holding Corporation
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: Rebecca Keaton Hinds
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: Adam C. Smedstad
Represented By: Andrew J Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Courier International, Inc.
Represented By: Lee L. Piovarcy
Represented By: Rebecca Keaton Hinds
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: Adam C. Smedstad
Represented By: Andrew J Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?