Gamboa v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Celedon Gamboa
Defendant: Lorie Davis and Debra Gibbs
Case Number: 4:2020cv00231
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Jesse Celedon Gamboa re: Compliance and Proof of Service, filed. (ltrevino, 3)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response, by Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Christian-Carnal, Sallie)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sallie Christian-Carnal on behalf of Lorie Davis-Director TDCJ-CID, filed. (Christian-Carnal, Sallie)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lorie Davis, Debra Gibbs. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail and NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to ISSUE SUMMONS (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified. Sent a copy to TDCJ- Office of General Counsel.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
January 22, 2020 Civil Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint, receipt number HOU093623, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner's Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jesse Celedon Gamboa.(olindor, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamboa v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Celedon Gamboa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?