McGowan v. Saul
Plaintiff: Melody D McGowan
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv00282
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Christina A Bryan
Referring Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, Ryan Patrick U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff in person, filed.(hlerma, 4) Modified on 1/30/2020 (hlerma, 4).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Melody D McGowan. (Application to Proceed IFP Granted on 1/21/2020 by The Honorable George C. Hanks, Jr.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGowan v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody D McGowan
Represented By: James Foster Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?