ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc. v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement and US Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 4:2020cv00397
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to April 22, 2020..(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Jimmy)
March 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Regarding Defendants' Answer Deadline by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to US Department of Homeland Security served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020; US Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020, filed.(Donatti, David)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon, #3 Summon)(hlerma, 4)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Issuance of Summons as to US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted attachment Summons, #2 Unredacted attachment Summons, #3 Unredacted attachment Summons)(Donatti, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed.(Donatti, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar Saldivar on behalf of ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andre Ivan Segura on behalf of ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc., filed. (Donatti, David)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against US Department of Homeland Security, US Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-24110725) filed by ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Donatti, David) Payment information added on 2/5/2020 (ltien, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc. v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACLU Foundation of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: David Alexander Donatti
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jimmy Anthony Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?