Bascomb et al v. Express Courier International Inc et al
Plaintiff: Angela Boyd, Roberto Arnold, Alfonzo Bryant, Shaun Younger, Joe Batie, Willie Bray, Tasha Burrell, Christopher Brown, Kenneth Bell, Fredrick Clarke, David Binkley, Barry Askins, George Cahill, Mary Beville, Joseph Walker, Sandra Beall, Jonathan Bonner, Robbie Adams, Sandra Brown, Jerryl Todd, John Butler, Reginald Brown, Jamil Pride, Andrew Ayers, Kimberly Blue, Jessie Bascomb, Shanica Bradley, Tony Smith, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Leroy Baines, Jerome Belser, Jerry Byrd, Michelle Cash and Hussam Alholwany
Defendant: Express Courier International, Inc. and EMP LSO Holding Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00420
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE Joint Notice of Related Cases and Request for Coordination for Settlement Approval and Dismissal by Jessie Bascomb, filed. (Sanford, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Sanford on behalf of Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger, filed. (Sanford, Joshua)
February 24, 2020 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
February 24, 2020 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc., filed.(Quillen, Emily)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 08:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt( Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(BrendaLacy, 4)
February 7, 2020 Filing 42 Case transferred in from Alabama Northern. Case Number 2:18-cv-00064; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #40 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, to Finalize Settlement. ORDER transferring case to the Southern District of Texas; Original electronic record and certified copies of docket entries will be electronically mailed to the Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 1/23/2019. (JLC)
January 16, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division, to Finalize Settlement by Jessie Bascomb. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer)(West, Joshua)
September 10, 2019 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT (Joint) per Order at ECF No. 36 by Jessie Bascomb. filed by Jessie Bascomb (West, Joshua)
July 12, 2019 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. filed by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger (West, Joshua)
May 14, 2019 Filing 37 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. filed by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger (West, Joshua)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ORDER: The court further STAYS all deadlines in this case so the parties may work through executing their settlement agreement. The court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report on May 14, 2019, and every 60 days thereafter, informing the court of the status of the settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 03/15/2019. (MCP)
March 14, 2019 Filing 35 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) re: Settlement and Request to Hold Deadlines in Abeyance by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. filed by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger (West, Joshua)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to TERM Defendant's #30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint because the parties will seek resolution of this matter through Mediation. ORDER GRANTING #33 Joint MOTION to Stay and the Court STAYS the proceedings in this case until March 1, 2019. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before March 14, 2019, informing the Court of the outcome of the Mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/11/2018. (JLC)
December 11, 2018 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Stay to Permit the Parties to Participate in Mediation by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. (West, Joshua)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE - This case comes before the court on Defendant Express Courier International's motion to dismiss the Plaintiffs' second amended complaint. (Doc. #30 ). The Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss will be due on or before December 13, 2018. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/20/2018. (KEK)
November 19, 2018 Filing 31 Brief re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint . (Adair, R)
November 19, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Express Courier International Inc. (Adair, R)
November 5, 2018 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Express Courier International Inc, filed by Shanica Bradley, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Jamil Pride, Michelle Cash, Kimberly Blue, Jerryl Todd, John Butler, Angela Boyd, Joseph Walker, Willie Bray, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Leroy Baines, Jonathan Bonner, Reginald Brown, Barry Askins, Roberto Arnold, Jerry Byrd, Tony Smith, Shaun Younger, Sandra Brown, Joe Batie, Tasha Burrell, Christopher Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Kenneth Bell, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Robbie Adams.(West, Joshua)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION to Dismiss and the Court hereby DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Plaintiffs' #7 First Amended Complaint. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to file a Second Amended Complaint on or before November 5, 2018 in accordance with the #27 Memorandum Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/5/2018. (JLC)
October 5, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 10/5/2018. (JLC)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEX ORDER granting #25 Motion to Admit Josh Sanford Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 9/4/18. (MMW)
August 30, 2018 PHV Fee paid for Josh Sanford in the amount of $50.00, Credit Card receipt number 1126-3163503, NDAL receipt #B4601091639. (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 8/31/2018 (JLC).
August 30, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Certification of Josh Sanford)(Evans, Daniel)
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 Evidentiary Material re: #23 REPLY (other) Notice of Supplemnetal Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Adair, R)
July 31, 2018 Filing 23 REPLY to re #22 to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc. (Adair, R)
July 16, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Op. and Order, Arroyo v. Express Courier Intl., Inc., No. 4:18-cv-10 (S.D. Tex. June 18, 2018), ECF No. 24)(West, Joshua)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' "Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Defendants' Motion To Dismiss" (Doc. 20) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before July 18, 2018. Defendants' reply, if necessary, is due on or before August 1, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/19/2018. (JWD)
June 18, 2018 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke, Jamil Pride, Tony Smith, Jerryl Todd, Joseph Walker, Shaun Younger. (West, Joshua)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #18 supporting brief- The Plaintiffs' response to the motion to dismiss will be due on or before June 27, 2018. Any reply brief, if necessary, will be due on or before July 10, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/6/18. (SAC )
June 5, 2018 Filing 18 Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Adair, R) Modified on 6/5/2018 (JLC).
June 5, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc. (Adair, R)
June 5, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc. filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc (Adair, R)
June 5, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc. filed by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International Inc (Adair, R)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Motions to Admit Emily A. Quillen (doc. 10), Charles Andrewscavage (doc. 11), Andrew Joseph Butcher (doc. 12), and Adam C. Smedstad (doc. 13) Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/25/18. (MMW)
April 23, 2018 PHV Fee paid for attorneys: 1) Quillen, 2) Scavage, 3) Butcher, and 4) Smedstad; $200.00, ALND receipt number B4601088437. (SAC )
April 18, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Adam C. Smedstad by Express Courier International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Adair, R)
April 18, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Joseph Butcher by Express Courier International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Adair, R)
April 18, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Charles Andrewscavage by Express Courier International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Adair, R)
April 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Emily A. Quillen by Express Courier International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Adair, R)
April 12, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shanica Bradley, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Jamil Pride, Michelle Cash, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Fredrick Clarke, Jerryl Todd, John Butler, Angela Boyd, Joseph Walker, Willie Bray, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Leroy Baines, Mary Beville, Jonathan Bonner, Reginald Brown, Barry Askins, Shaun Younger, Roberto Arnold, Jerry Byrd, Tony Smith, Sandra Brown, Joe Batie, Tasha Burrell, Christopher Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Kenneth Bell, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Robbie Adams. Express Courier International Inc waiver sent on 4/12/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. (Evans, Daniel)
April 12, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Shanica Bradley, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Jamil Pride, Michelle Cash, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Fredrick Clarke, Jerryl Todd, John Butler, Angela Boyd, Joseph Walker, Willie Bray, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Leroy Baines, Mary Beville, Jonathan Bonner, Reginald Brown, Barry Askins, Shaun Younger, Roberto Arnold, Jerry Byrd, Tony Smith, Sandra Brown, Joe Batie, Tasha Burrell, Christopher Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Kenneth Bell, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Robbie Adams. EMP LSO Holding Corporation waiver sent on 4/12/2018, answer due 6/11/2018. (Evans, Daniel)
April 11, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shanica Bradley, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Jamil Pride, Michelle Cash, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Fredrick Clarke, Jerryl Todd, John Butler, Angela Boyd, Joseph Walker, Willie Bray, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Leroy Baines, Mary Beville, Jonathan Bonner, Reginald Brown, Barry Askins, Shaun Younger, Roberto Arnold, Jerry Byrd, Tony Smith, Sandra Brown, Joe Batie, Tasha Burrell, Christopher Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Kenneth Bell, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Robbie Adams.(Evans, Daniel)
February 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by R Brett Adair on behalf of Express Courier International Inc (Adair, R)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Joshua West Pro Hac Vice. The court advises counsel that it may require at least one attorney for each party to be physically present at every hearing and status conference. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 2/13/18. (MMW)
February 6, 2018 PHV Fee paid: $ 50, ALND receipt#: B4601086561/ receipt number 1126-3022215. (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 2/7/2018 (SAC ).
February 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robbie Adams, Hussam Alholwany, Roberto Arnold, Barry Askins, Andrew Ayers, Leroy Baines, Jessie Bascomb, Joe Batie, Sandra Beall, Kenneth Bell, Jerome Belser, Mary Beville, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Jonathan Bonner, Angela Boyd, Shanica Bradley, Willie Bray, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Christopher Brown, Reginald Brown, Sandra Brown, Alfonzo Bryant, Tasha Burrell, John Butler, Jerry Byrd, George Cahill, Michelle Cash, Fredrick Clarke. (Evans, Daniel)
January 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International Inc.; given to plaintiff at intake. (SAC )
January 18, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, ALND receipt#: B4601086099/ receipt_number 1126-3007566. related document #1 COMPLAINT against EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International Inc, filed by Willie Bray, Shanica Bradley, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Mary Beville, Leroy Baines, Jonathan Bonner, Michelle Cash, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Reginald Brown, Fredrick Clarke, Barry Askins, Jerry Byrd, Roberto Arnold, Sandra Brown, Tasha Burrell, Joe Batie, John Butler, Alfonzo Bryant, Christopher Brown, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Kenneth Bell, Angela Boyd, Robbie Adams, et al.(SAC ). (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 1/22/2018 (SAC ).
January 12, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail, filed by all plaintiffs. (SAC )
January 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International Inc, filed by Willie Bray, Shanica Bradley, Andrew Ayers, George Cahill, Jerome Belser, Hussam Alholwany, Sandra Beall, Jessie Bascomb, Mary Beville, Leroy Baines, Jonathan Bonner, Michelle Cash, David Binkley, Kimberly Blue, Reginald Brown, Fredrick Clarke, Barry Askins, Jerry Byrd, Roberto Arnold, Sandra Brown, Tasha Burrell, Joe Batie, John Butler, Alfonzo Bryant, Christopher Brown, Brazzie Brown, Jr, Kenneth Bell, Angela Boyd, Robbie Adams, et al.(SAC )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bascomb et al v. Express Courier International Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Courier International, Inc.
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Butcher
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP LSO Holding Corporation
Represented By: R Brett Adair
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Butcher
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Boyd
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Arnold
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfonzo Bryant
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Younger
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Batie
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Bray
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tasha Burrell
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Brown
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Bell
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Clarke
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Binkley
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Askins
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Cahill
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Beville
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Walker
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Beall
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Bonner
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Adams
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Brown
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerryl Todd
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Butler
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Brown
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamil Pride
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Ayers
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Blue
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Bascomb
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanica Bradley
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Smith
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brazzie Brown, Jr
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Baines
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Belser
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Byrd
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cash
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussam Alholwany
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?