Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. The International Funplex Office Sports Bar and Grill LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Lloyd S. Moody, Veronica Hernandez, WT Development, L.L.C. and The International Funplex Office Sports Bar and Grill LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00494
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTED #8 MOTION to Substitute Service of Process (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Service of Process by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 6/17/2020. Show Cause Response due by 5/14/2020 Initial Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
March 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/7/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas, filed. (sashabranner, 4)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Veronica Hernandez, Lloyd S. Moody, The International Funplex Office Sports Bar and Grill LLC, WT Development, L.L.C.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24179848) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. The International Funplex Office Sports Bar and Grill LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd S. Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT Development, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The International Funplex Office Sports Bar and Grill LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?