Shinsho American Corporation v. HyQuality Alloys
Plaintiff: Shinsho American Corporation
Defendant: HyQuality Alloys and HyQuality Alloys, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00577
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against HyQuality Alloys, LLC filed by Shinsho American Corporation.(Farrell, Thomas)
March 27, 2020 Filing 27 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Shinsho American Corporation, filed.(Farrell, Thomas)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying #25 Motion for Contempt.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 10, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Contempt by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Hampton, Charles)
March 10, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Shinsho American Corporation, filed.(Farrell, Thomas)
March 6, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HyQuality Alloys, LLC, filed.(Drinnon, Rodney)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kristi S. Poskus to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoy, 4)
March 3, 2020 registry deposit Filing fee: $500, receipt number HOU094511 re: #21 Injunction, filed. (olindor, 4)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 AGREED ORDER GRANTING Injunction re #6 Motion for Emergency; #7 Motion for Emergency; #8 Motion for Emergency; #2 Motion for Entry of Order.(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
March 3, 2020 Filing 20 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Granting Preliminary Injunction re: #7 Second EMERGENCY MOTION, #8 Third EMERGENCY MOTION, #6 Supplemental EMERGENCY MOTION, #2 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temprary Restraining Order, filed.(Farrell, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support of the Issuance of a Preliminary Injunction re: #7 Second EMERGENCY MOTION, #8 Third EMERGENCY MOTION, #6 Supplemental EMERGENCY MOTION, #2 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temprary Restraining Order by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(Farrell, Thomas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 STATEMENT Regarding Removed Case re: #3 Order in Removed Cases - FORM - Miller by HyQuality Alloys, LLC, filed.(Drinnon, Rodney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 Letter to Court enclosing Exhibit 1b by HyQuality Alloys, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1b)(Drinnon, Rodney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Takayuki Haraguchi, filed by HyQuality Alloys, LLC. (Drinnon, Rodney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 Second EMERGENCY MOTION, #8 Third EMERGENCY MOTION, #6 Supplemental EMERGENCY MOTION, #2 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temprary Restraining Order, filed by HyQuality Alloys, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1a, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 2a, #5 Exhibit 2b, #6 Exhibit 2c, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 3a, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 4a)(Drinnon, Rodney)
March 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Corporate Representative of Shinsho American Corporation by HyQuality Alloys, LLC, filed. (Drinnon, Rodney)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition to HyQuality Alloys, LLC and Subpoena Duces Tecum by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. (Farrell, Thomas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Kristi S. Poskus to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Hampton, Charles)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Spencer J. Marks to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter of Good Standing)(Hampton, Charles)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gray H Miller. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2020 re temporary restraining order/injunction. Oral argument heard. Defendant's briefing is due by close of business on 3/2/2020. Injunction Hearing set for 3/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Gray H Miller. Appearances: Rodney Lee Drinnon, Thomas M Farrell, Charles Bedford Hampton.(Court Reporter: G.Dye), filed.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9D before Judge Gray H Miller. Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Third EMERGENCY MOTION by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Third Supplement to Motion for Emergency TRO)(Farrell, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 Second EMERGENCY MOTION by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2020. (Farrell, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 Supplemental EMERGENCY MOTION by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/16/2020. (Farrell, Thomas)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 3/27/2020(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Defendant HyQuality Alloys, LLC shall file its response to Shinsho's motion for temporary restraining order within ten days of the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order in Removed Cases. Statement due within ten days. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Temprary Restraining Order by Shinsho American Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Setting Further Hearing, #3 Exhibit 1)(Farrell, Thomas)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County District, case number 20-02-02305 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24216815) filed by HyQuality Alloys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Drinnon, Rodney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinsho American Corporation v. HyQuality Alloys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shinsho American Corporation
Represented By: Charles Bedford Hampton
Represented By: Thomas M Farrell
Represented By: Kristi S Poskus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HyQuality Alloys
Represented By: Rodney Lee Drinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HyQuality Alloys, LLC
Represented By: Rodney Lee Drinnon
Represented By: Eric Manuel Utermohlen
Represented By: Isaac Villarreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?