Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A.
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00593
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed.(Dougherty, Colin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin D. Dougherty on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed. (Dougherty, Colin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, filed.(Roberts, Sean)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24230429) filed by Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A..(Roberts, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin D Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A.
Represented By: Sean Alan Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?