MARSHALL et al v. EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC et al
Plaintiff: EVITA BELL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, Kevin Marshall, PHILLIP HULETT, RON HARDING, DENISE SHORTER, JOSEPH RENNE, PAUL DUTCHER, LORI KREISHER, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, MARY THOMPSON, NANCY BAKER and AZARIAH ROBINSON
Defendant: Express Courier International, Inc. and EMP LSO Holding Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00796
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE Joint Notice of Related Cases and Request for Coordination for Settlement Approval and Dismissal by NANCY BAKER, filed. (Sanford, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, Kevin Marshall, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON, filed.(Sanford, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Josh Sanford on behalf of NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, Kevin Marshall, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON, filed. (Sanford, Joshua)
March 16, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by EMP LSO Holding Corporation, Express Courier International, Inc., filed.(Quillen, Emily)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
March 5, 2020 Filing 64 Case transferred in from Florida Northern. Case Number 4:18-cv-00048; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING #61 JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER. The motion (ECF No. #61 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk shall take necessary steps to transfer this case to the Southern District of Texas, Houston Division. When the transfer is complete, the Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 03/04/2020. (rcb)
January 16, 2020 Filing 62 Joint Response to Order to Show Cause by NANCY BAKER. (WEST, JOSHUA) Modified to edit title on 1/24/2020 (rcb).
January 14, 2020 Filing 61 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas to Finalize Settlement by NANCY BAKER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/28/2020). (WEST, JOSHUA)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. On June 5, 2019, the parties filed a status report, indicating that they had settled the case and would file a motion to transfer. ECF No. #58 . Nothing has been filed in the seven months since. The parties are directed to show cause, no later than ten days from the date of this order, why the case should not be dismissed. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 01/07/2020. Show Cause Response due by 1/17/2020. (rcb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:18cv48-AW/CAS. (pll)
June 5, 2019 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, EVITA BELL, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #56 JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties shall either move to transfer this action or provide this Court with another status report on or before June 5, 2019. ( Status Report due by 6/5/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/06/2019. (toy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 56 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, EVITA BELL, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #54 JOINT STATUS REPORT. The parties shall either move to transfer this action or provide this Court with another status report on or before May 3, 2019. ( Status Report due by 5/3/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/02/2019. (toy)
April 1, 2019 Filing 54 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, EVITA BELL, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ACKNOWLEDGING #52 JOINT REPORT OF MEDIATION AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STATUS REPORT. The parties shall either dismiss this action or provide this Court with a status report on or before April 1, 2019.( Status Report due by 4/1/2019.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 03/18/2019. (toy)
February 7, 2019 Filing 52 MEDIATION REPORT - Settled. (QUILLEN, EMILY)
December 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION TO PERMIT PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION. The parties' #50 joint motion to stay is GRANTED until 3/1/2019. On or before 3/14/2019 the parties shall either submit a notice informing this Court that the matter has been resolved or, if the matter is not resolved through mediation, that the parties submit a joint proposal for a discovery schedule to govern the litigation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/2/2018. (kjw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 50 Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation to Permit the Parties to Participate in Mediation by NANCY BAKER, EVITA BELL, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
November 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/17/2018 re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (amm)
November 16, 2018 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, EVITA BELL, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
November 13, 2018 Filing 48 Defendants' ANSWER to #47 Amended Complaint by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (QUILLEN, EMILY)
October 31, 2018 Filing 47 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC, filed by DENISE SHORTER, LORI KREISHER, KALE DRISCOLL, AZARIAH ROBINSON, PHILLIP HULETT, JOSEPH RENNE, EVITA BELL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, NANCY BAKER. (WEST, JOSHUA)
October 17, 2018 Reset deadlines Re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Status Report due by 11/16/2018. (vkm)
October 17, 2018 Filing 46 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. The motion to dismiss, ECF No. #24 is GRANTED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before 10/31/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/16/2018. (kjw)
October 10, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE of Defendants' Supplemental Authority by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bascomb v. Express Courier International, Inc. Order) (BUTCHER, ANDREW)
September 17, 2018 Set Discovery Status Report Deadline - Status Report due by 10/17/2018. (cle)
September 14, 2018 Filing 43 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
August 15, 2018 Reset deadlines Re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Status Report due by 9/14/2018. (vkm)
August 15, 2018 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER re: #37 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Discovery extended to by 1/2/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 1/23/2019. Mediation Report due by 2/13/2019.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/6/2018. (ckm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority Supporting Defendants' #24 Motion to Dismiss by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order re: Ryte v. Express Courier International) (SMEDSTAD, ADAM) Modified on 8/3/2018 to link corresponding document (ckm).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING TRANSFER re #23 COURTESY COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER re MDL No. 2854 (vkm)
July 31, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order, Allen v. Express Courier Int'l., Inc., No. 3:18-cv-28-MOC-DSC (W.D. N.C. July 25, 2018), ECF No. 25) (WEST, JOSHUA)
July 30, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed re: #37 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (cle)
July 27, 2018 Filing 37 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (QUILLEN, EMILY)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #34 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 7/24/2018. (vkm)
July 24, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH)
July 24, 2018 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH) Modified on 7/25/2018 to reflect unopposed motion (vkm).
July 16, 2018 Reset deadlines Re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Status Report due by 8/15/2018. (vkm)
July 16, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Op. and Order, Arroyo v. Express Courier Intl., Inc., No. 4:18-cv-10 (S.D. Tex. June 18, 2018), ECF No. 24) (WEST, JOSHUA)
July 16, 2018 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPONDTO MOTION TO DISMISS - This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. #30 . The motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the motion to dismiss on or before 7/18/2018. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/19/2018. (vkm)
June 18, 2018 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
June 14, 2018 Reset deadlines Re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Status Report due by 7/16/2018. (vkm)
June 14, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE EXHIBIT A by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM - MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF (BURGESS, ELIZABETH)
June 14, 2018 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
June 13, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH)
June 13, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH)
June 13, 2018 Filing 25 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH) Modified on 6/14/2018 to correct document title and relationship (vkm).
June 13, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (BURGESS, ELIZABETH)
June 5, 2018 Filing 23 COURTESY COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF ACTIONS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS (FILED IN MDL No. 2854) (vkm)
May 15, 2018 Rest deadlines Re: #8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Status Report due by 6/14/2018. (vkm)
May 15, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by NANCY BAKER, JENNIFER BAREFIELD, EVITA BELL, ANTHONY DATTOLO, KALE DRISCOLL, MICHAEL DRISCOLL, PAUL DUTCHER, RON HARDING, PHILLIP HULETT, LORI KREISHER, KEVIN MARSHALL, JOSEPH RENNE, AZARIAH ROBINSON, DENISE SHORTER, MARY THOMPSON. (WEST, JOSHUA)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF DEADLINES - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines in Initial Scheduling Order. ECF No. #20 . The motion is GRANTED (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/27/2018). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/10/2018. (vkm)
May 9, 2018 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Extend TimeDeadlines in Initial Scheduling Order by KEVIN MARSHALL. (MORGAN, CHARLES)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - Joshua West moves for his admission to appear pro hac vice in this case. ECF No. #18 . Mr. West has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. Accordingly, his motion is GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/26/2018. (vkm)
April 26, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joshua West.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4163900.) by KEVIN MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (MORGAN, CHARLES)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE - Charles Andrewscavage moves for his admission to appear pro hac vice in this case. ECF No. #16 . Mr. Andrewscavage has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. Accordingly, his motion is GRANTED (Appointed CHARLES ANDREWSCAVAGE for EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/25/2018. (vkm)
April 24, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles Andrewscavage.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4161487.) by EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (ANDREWSCAVAGE, CHARLES)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADMITTING ANDREW J. BUTCHER PRO HAC VICE - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Butcher. ECF No. #13 . Mr. Butcher has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and Mr. Butcher is admitted pro hac vice as additional counsel for Defendants. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/23/2018. (vkm)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADMITTING ADAM C. SMEDSTAD PRO HAC VICE - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam C. Smedstad. ECF No. #12 . Mr. Smedstad has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and Mr. Smedstad is admitted pro hac vice as additional counsel for Defendants. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/23/2018. (vkm)
April 23, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Butcher.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4159897.) by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (BUTCHER, ANDREW)
April 23, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam C. Smedstad.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4159872.) by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (SMEDSTAD, ADAM)
April 18, 2018 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by KEVIN MARSHALL. (MORGAN, CHARLES)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADMITTING EMILY A. QUILLEN PRO HAC VICE - This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Emily A. Quillen. ECF No. #9 . Ms. Quillen has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission. Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED and Ms. Quillen is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Defendants. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/18/2018. (vkm)
April 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily A. Quillen.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4153806.) by EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC. (QUILLEN, EMILY)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/30/2018. Discovery due by 8/14/2018. Status Report due by 5/16/2018. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/16/2018. (vkm)
April 16, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KEVIN MARSHALL. EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION waiver sent on 4/16/2018, answer due 6/15/2018. (MORGAN, CHARLES)
April 16, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KEVIN MARSHALL. EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC waiver sent on 4/16/2018, answer due 6/15/2018. (MORGAN, CHARLES)
February 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER BARKAS on behalf of EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION, EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC (BARKAS, CHRISTOPHER)
January 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC and EMP LSO HOLDING CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summons (EMP)) (vkm)
January 19, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT TO ATTORNEY RYAN MORGAN: Re #1 Complaint - Counsel is advised that party names (including aliases) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website). The party names will be corrected by the clerk. (vkm)
January 19, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 1-3335. Fee status updated to paid. (kdm)
January 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Express Courier International, Inc., and EMP LSO Holding Corporation, filed by Kevin Marshall, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons- Express Courier, #3 Summons- EMP LSO Holding) (MORGAN, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARSHALL et al v. EXPRESS COURIER INTERNATIONAL INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Courier International, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Butcher
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARKAS
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: ELIZABETH BROWN BURGESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP LSO Holding Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Butcher
Represented By: Emily A Quillen
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARKAS
Represented By: Adam Carl Smedstad
Represented By: Charles Andrewscavage
Represented By: ELIZABETH BROWN BURGESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVITA BELL
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DRISCOLL
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Marshall
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP HULETT
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RON HARDING
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE SHORTER
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RENNE
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL DUTCHER
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI KREISHER
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY DATTOLO
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALE DRISCOLL
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER BAREFIELD
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY THOMPSON
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY BAKER
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AZARIAH ROBINSON
Represented By: CHARLES RYAN MORGAN
Represented By: Joshua Lee West
Represented By: Joshua Jon Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?