Simmons v. Aames Funding Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gary Steve Simmons
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing and Aames Funding Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00864
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to SD/TX - Galveston Division. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 5, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to SD/TX - Galveston Division, filed. (sanderson, 4)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 DOCKETED IN ERROR CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (lbdewi, 4) Modified on 3/24/2020 (klove, 4).
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (lbdewi, 4)
March 17, 2020 Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(BrendaLacy, 4)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gary Steve Simmons.(jengonzalez, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Aames Funding Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aames Funding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Steve Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?