Sterling v. Greater Houston Transportation Company et al
Plaintiff: Paul Sterling
Defendant: Greater Houston Transportation Company, Texas Paratransit, Inc., Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc. and Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County
Case Number: 4:2020cv00910
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Greater Houston Transportation Company, Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc., filed.(Hill, Martyn)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION re: Arbitration by Paul Sterling, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foty, Donny)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Paul Sterling, filed.(Foty, Donny)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Greater Houston Transportation Company, Texas Paratransit, Inc., Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc., filed.(Hill, Martyn)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: The Court orders the parties to confer and provide a status report as to whether they have a joint or conflicting view on the propriety of transfer.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Metro's deadline to file its responsive pleading is extended 21 days.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time TO ANSWER by Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Londa, Jeffrey)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taft L. Foley II on behalf of Paul Sterling, filed. (Foley, Taft)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Greater Houston Transportation Company served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020; Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020; Texas Paratransit, Inc. served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020; Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc. served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020, filed.(Foty, Donny)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, filed. (Russell, Carolyn)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rcastro, 4)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Paul Sterling, filed.(Foty, Donny)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Greater Houston Transportation Company, Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, Texas Paratransit, Inc., Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc., filed.(Foty, Donny)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greater Houston Transportation Company, Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County, Texas Paratransit, Inc., Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24393295) filed by Paul Sterling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foty, Donny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling v. Greater Houston Transportation Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Houston Transportation Company
Represented By: Martyn B Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Paratransit, Inc.
Represented By: Martyn B Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Cab Paratransit Services, Inc.
Represented By: Martyn B Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Transit Authority of Harris County
Represented By: Jeffrey C Londa
Represented By: Carolyn A Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Sterling
Represented By: Donny J Foty
Represented By: Taft L Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?