Halliburton v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline S Halliburton
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-KR2, PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and NewRez Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00919
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Jacqueline S Halliburton, filed.(Sechelski, Rachel)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jacqueline S Halliburton, filed.(Sechelski, Rachel)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/22/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NewRez Mortgage, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-KR2 identifying New Residential Investment Corporation for NewRez, Ocwen Financial Corporation for PHH Mortgage, and Bank of New York Mellon Corporation for Bank of New York Mellon, N.A. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Stroope, Emily)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 125th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-13569 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24398522) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-KR2, NewRez Mortgage, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knox, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halliburton v. PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, Inc., Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2004-KR2
Represented By: Emily G Stroope
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation, on its own behalf and as successor-by-merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Emily G Stroope
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Emily G Stroope
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline S Halliburton
Represented By: Amir Befroui
Represented By: Rachel Leigh Sechelski
Represented By: Ernest W Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?