UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY
Case Number: 4:2020cv01084
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to Property Custodian, Fines Penalties and Forfeitures on May 22, 2020 re: Warrant of Arrest in Rem, filed.(Lansden, Karen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest in Rem issued, filed. (ghassan, 4)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER: The clerk will issue the warrant of arrest in rem #4 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 Warrant of Arrest in Rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Lansden, Karen)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY, filed.(Gladden, Gregory)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 CLAIM for Seized Property filed by $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY.(Gladden, Gregory)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Lansden, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $98,020.00 IN US CURRENCY
Represented By: Gregory Charles Gladden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Karen Mitchell Lansden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?