Abet Life, Inc. v. Azar II
Plaintiff: Abet Life, Inc.
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar II
Case Number: 4:2020cv01169
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Gray H Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Order for Conference Deadline and Disclosure of Interested Parties (Dkt. # 2) by Alex M Azar II, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Lurese A Terrell re: #9 Order,,, filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Alex M Azar II, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Proposed Order)(Vela, Jose)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Abet Life is ordered to serve DHHS with its motion (Dkt. 7) along with a copy of this order in the same manner it served DHHS with a copy of its complaint and summons. See Dkt. 5 (proving Rule 4(i) service upon (1) Azar; (2) William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States; and (3) Ryan K. Patrick, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Texas). Proof of such service shall be filed with the court.Further, the Government shall file its response to Abet Lifes motion within ten days after service on the United States attorney. See Rule 12(a)(2).(Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(rkonieczny, 4)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Abet Life, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Abet Life, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Mark)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Abet Life, Inc., filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M Azar II served on 4/13/2020, answer due 6/12/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar II. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2, #2 Summons #3)(DawnWaggoner, 4)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M Azar II, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Scheduling Order Deadline date 5/29/2020 (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar II (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24502322) filed by Abet Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abet Life, Inc. v. Azar II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M Azar II
Represented By: Jose Vela, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abet Life, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?