OHVA Inc. v. Ace Merchant Processing LLC
Plaintiff: OHVA Inc.
Defendant: Ace Merchant Processing LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01244
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 MOTION for Continuance of Hearing...*** Initial Conference reset for 7/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, with the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order due 1 week prior. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Continuance of Hearing by OHVA Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Substitute Service.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Substitute Service by OHVA Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ace Merchant Processing LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/12/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Isaac Rabicoff on behalf of OHVA Inc., filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to OHVA Inc., filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Patent Report by OHVA Inc., filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OHVA Inc., filed.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ace Merchant Processing LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24526702) filed by OHVA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OHVA Inc. v. Ace Merchant Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace Merchant Processing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OHVA Inc.
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?