Gonisor v. Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania et al
Plaintiff: Lynne Gonisor and Lynne Gonsior
Defendant: AIG Claims, Inc., Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania and Janis Dunn
Case Number: 4:2020cv01765
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ewing Werlein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand, filed by Lynne Gonsior. (Dennis, Patrick)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified. (marflores, 4)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Remand filed by AIG Claims, Inc., Janis Dunn, Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Tod)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time (Defendants' Motion to Extend Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, or Alternatively, Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File a Response) by AIG Claims, Inc., Janis Dunn, Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Phillips, Tod)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order by Lynne Gonsior, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennis, Patrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIG Claims, Inc., Janis Dunn, Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania, filed. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement)(Phillips, Tod)
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Lynne Gonsior, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Avery, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Lynne Gonsior, filed.(Dennis, Patrick)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lynne Gonisor, filed.(Dennis, Patrick)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lynne Gonisor, filed.(Dennis, Patrick)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 02:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. (Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury by AIG Claims, Inc., Janis Dunn, Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania, filed.(Phillips, Tod)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District Harris County, case number 2020-18678 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24687453) filed by Janis Dunn, AIG Claims, Inc., Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(Phillips, Tod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonisor v. Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Claims, Inc.
Represented By: Tod A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State Of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Tod A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janis Dunn
Represented By: Tod A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Gonisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Gonsior
Represented By: Jeffrey I Avery
Represented By: Patrick Mason Dennis
Represented By: Michael Patrick Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?