Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, Inc. v. Azar
Plaintiff: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Bridge Solutions and Bridgett Memorial Healthcare doing business as Bridge Solutions
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Case Number: 4:2020cv01770
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M Azar served on 7/2/2020, answer due 8/31/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Alex M Azar served on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, filed.(Kennedy, Mark)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USA, US Attorney, Attorney General, Alex M Azar. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4) Modified on 5/22/2020 (ChristopherSarrat, 4).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Alex M Azar, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennedy, Mark)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar filed by Bridgett Memorial Healthcare.(Kennedy, Mark)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex M Azar (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24689367) filed by Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Bridge Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kennedy, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, Inc. v. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare, Inc. d/b/a Bridge Solutions
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgett Memorial Healthcare doing business as Bridge Solutions
Represented By: Mark Stephen Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?