Phaethon International Company A.G. v. Veles Bulk S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Phaethon International Company A.G.
Defendant: Veles Bulk S.A., Varamar Ltd and Veles Bulk Shipping Ltd
Case Number: 4:2020cv01821
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Eemslift Ellen on 5/28/2020 re: Verified Complaint to the Master/Captain, filed.(sguevara, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 18 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Eemslift Ellen on 5/28/2020 re: Verified Complaint to Vessel Agent, filed.(sguevara, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 17 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/A Eemslift Ellen on 5/28/2020 re: Rule B Attachment of Bunkers, filed.(sguevara, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Eemslift Ellen on 5/28/2020 re: Rule B Attachment of Vessel, filed.(sguevara, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 15 RETURN of Service Executed as to M/V Eemslift Ellen on 5/28/2020 re: Verified Complaint, filed.(sguevara, 4)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 Final DISMISSAL. On the notice of Phaethon International, this case is dismissed with prejudice. Case terminated on 6/3/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Varamar Ltd, Veles Bulk S.A., Veles Bulk Shipping Ltd by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. (Sparkman, Briton)
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Release of Attachment of Bunkers re: #8 Order by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sparkman, Briton)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER on Notice. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Substituting Custodian terminating #4 , #7 .(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 WARRANT to Seize Cargo issued, filed. (ghassan, 4)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Seize Cargo Onboard M.V. Eemslift Ellen terminating #3 , #7 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite consideration of Original Verified Complaint [DE 1] and Ex Parte Motions [DE 3 and DE 4] by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Process Of Maritime Attachment And Garnishment)(Sparkman, Briton)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret L. Manns on behalf of Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. (Manns, Margaret)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute National Maritime Services as Substitute Custodian by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Sparkman, Briton)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment)(Sparkman, Briton)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Phaethon International Company A.G., filed.(Sparkman, Briton)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Varamar Ltd, Veles Bulk S.A., Veles Bulk Shipping Ltd (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24708013) filed by Phaethon International Company A.G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Verification, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sparkman, Briton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phaethon International Company A.G. v. Veles Bulk S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veles Bulk S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varamar Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veles Bulk Shipping Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phaethon International Company A.G.
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Represented By: Margaret Lynette Manns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?