McCune et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Jordan and Allen McCune
Defendant: Justin Johnson and Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv01927
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #9 Notice of Dismissal. Case terminated on 07/14/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
July 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Allen McCune by Allen McCune, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beckcom, Brian)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Adams, Kent)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed.(Adams, Kent)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Adams, Kent)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Wayne Jordan, Allen McCune, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Vujasinovic, Vuk)
June 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Deadline to respond to the operative pleadings is extended through 06/22/2020. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Kent)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Judicial District Court, Harris County Texas, case number 2020-30440 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24740012) filed by Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Adams, Kent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCune et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonestar West Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen McCune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?