BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Ferreyros, S.A. et al
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc., Ferreyros, S.A. and Forbis Logistics Corp.
Counter Defendant: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Intervenor Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01934
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Referring Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 1300
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed.(Waguespack, Jason)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ENTRY AND ORDER for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge. Status conference. All parties present via Zoom. Parties provided update on settlement discussions. Defendants requested and received leave to file a motion for reconsideration of the motion by Defendants for summary judgment. Dkt 13. The Parties were instructed to file a proposed amended scheduling and docket control order. Appearances: Andrew V Waters f/ Plaintiff; Robert Glen Moll f/ Defendant. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 22, 2021 Filing 32 MOTION for Reconsideration by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2021. (Moll, Robert)
September 17, 2021 Filing 31 Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed.(Waguespack, Jason)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re: The parties must file a proposed amended scheduling and docket control order, while noting all deadlines that have previously expired. They must also file a Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan in accord with Section 9(b) of this Court's procedures by September 17, 2021. Status Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 23, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Eskridge. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge David Hittner recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #23 Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 23, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #23 MOTION for Reconsideration of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Waguespack, Jason)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Intervene as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company a/s/o Ferroyros, S.A. and a/s/o Caterpillar, Inc. as counter-plaintiff.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
July 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Intervene by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moll, Robert)
July 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Reconsideration of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moll, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #14 Motion for Leave to File; denying #19 Motion for Summary Judgment.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
April 14, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment, filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Waguespack, Jason)
April 7, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Moll, Robert)
March 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment or Alternatively Partial Summary Judgment by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, A-1, A-2, and A-3, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C and C-1, #4 Exhibit D and D-1, #5 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, Jason)
March 5, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY in Support of #14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim, filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Waguespack, Jason)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to #14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim, filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Moll, Robert)
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY in Support of #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Moll, Robert)
February 19, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition to #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, Jason)
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Answer to Counterclaim by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Answer to Counterclaim, #2 Proposed Order)(Waguespack, Jason)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Moll, Robert)
December 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Serving Documents by Caterpillar, Inc., filed. (Moll, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: September/October 2021. ETT: 3 days. Bench trial. Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/18/2020 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 11/30/2020. Deft Expert Witness List due by 12/31/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/31/2021. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/31/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2020. Scheduling order issued. Appearances: Andrew V Waters, Robert Glen Moll.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez), filed.(jmarchand, 4)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed.(Waguespack, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Forbis Logistics Corp. by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed. (Waguespack, Jason)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caterpillar, Inc., filed.(Moll, Robert)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG by Caterpillar, Inc., filed.(Moll, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed.(Waguespack, Jason)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Andrew V. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Andrew V. Waters to Appear Pro Hac Vice by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/29/2020. (Waguespack, Jason)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caterpillar, Inc., Ferreyros, S.A., Forbis Logistics Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24742451) filed by BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Waguespack, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG v. Ferreyros, S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Glen Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferreyros, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forbis Logistics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: BBC Chartering Carriers GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Jason P Waguespack
Represented By: Andrew V Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Robert Glen Moll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?