National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Cathey
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Jacob Druce Cathey
Case Number: 4:2020cv02038
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of National Union and against Jacob Druce Cathey. Case terminated on 9/17/2020(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment against Jacob Druce Cathey by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Judy Perez, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Matthew A. Lipman, Esquire)(Lipman, Matthew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks ENTRY OF DEFAULT against Jacob Druce Cathey Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER re: #8 Request for Entry of Default, filed.(Lipman, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Jacob Druce Cathey by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew A. Lipman, Esquire)(Lipman, Matthew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 Amended CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., AIG Property Casualty Inc., American International Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Lipman, Matthew)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Jacob Druce Cathey served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020, filed.(Lipman, Matthew)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jacob Druce Cathey. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jacob Druce Cathey, filed.(Lipman, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., AIG Property Casualty Inc., American International Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Lipman, Matthew)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacob Druce Cathey (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24778335) filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Lipman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Matthew A Lipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Druce Cathey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?